Federal Insurance Company v. Ices Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Express Services, Inc. and Ices Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv00520
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Express Services, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/17/2018) (RGG, Chambers)
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 CROSS-CLAIM against Ices Corporation by Express Services, Inc. (With attachments) (Donnell, Bradley)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER w/jury demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Express Services, Inc. (Donnell, Bradley) Modified on 11/15/2018 to add text w/jury demand (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Express Services, Inc. (Donnell, Bradley)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bradley Kent Donnell on behalf of Express Services, Inc. [Note: Attorney Bradley Kent Donnell added to party Express Services, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Donnell, Bradley)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Express Services, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Federal Insurance Company (With attachments) (Goolsby, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Suzanne Claude Radcliff on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Radcliff, Suzanne)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan : It is hereby ordered Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Out-of-State Counsel [Dkt. #6] Suzanne C. Radcliff is granted ; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (djh, Dpty Clk)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Suzanne C. Radcliff to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1971715) by Federal Insurance Company (With attachments) (Goolsby, Robert)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Chubb Corporation, The for Federal Insurance Company) by Federal Insurance Company (Goolsby, Robert)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Express Services, Inc., Ices Corporation (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Federal Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Express Services, Inc., Ices Corporation (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1968709) by Federal Insurance Company (Goolsby, Robert)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Federal Insurance Company (Goolsby, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Ices Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Todd Goolsby
Represented By: Suzanne Claude Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Services, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Kent Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ices Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?