Wells v. Client Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Patrick Wells
Defendant: Client Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00524
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Client Services, Inc. (Irby, Bobby)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Client Services, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/10/2018) (RGG, Chambers)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Client Services, Inc. [Note: Attorney Bobby Glynn Irby added to party Client Services, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Irby, Bobby)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Client Services, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Patrick Wells (With attachments) (Wandres, Victor)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Client Services, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Client Services, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1969423) by Patrick Wells (Wandres, Victor)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Patrick Wells (Wandres, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Client Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Client Services, Inc.
Represented By: Bobby Glynn Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Wells
Represented By: Victor R Wandres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?