Evans et al v. Arvest Bank
Plaintiff: Boris Bernard and Vera Dee Evans
Defendant: Arvest Bank
Case Number: 4:2018cv00530
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Vera Dee Evans (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs are advised that the entire Motion for Leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis must be completed before the Court can rule on such a motion. Plaintiffs may refile a complete Motion for Leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis no later than November 7, 2018, or they will be required to pay the filing fee. See LCvR 3.2 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 11/7/2018); denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Boris Bernard, Vera Dee Evans (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 10/15/2018 to correct file date (sc, Dpty Clk).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Vera Dee Evans, Boris Bernard (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans et al v. Arvest Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boris Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Dee Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvest Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?