Martinka v. PennWell Corporation

Plaintiff: Paul Martinka
Defendant: PennWell Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv00541
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
0 Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
1 Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/4/2019) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Partial Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 11] ; striking/withdrawing document(s); granting #11 Motion to Withdraw Documents(s) (Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss ) (Documents Terminated: #7 MOTION to Dismiss ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER (Re: #1 Complaint ) by PennWell Corporation (Wilkes, Keith)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) (Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss ) by PennWell Corporation (Wilkes, Keith)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Defendant has filed a Partial Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 7] which should first be resolved (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing PennWell Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Clarion Events Holdings, Inc. for PennWell Corporation) by PennWell Corporation (Wilkes, Keith)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by PennWell Corporation (With attachments) (Wilkes, Keith) Modified on 12/7/2018 - WITHDRAWN per 13 (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Keith A Wilkes on behalf of PennWell Corporation [Note: Attorney Keith A Wilkes added to party PennWell Corporation(pty:dft).] (Wilkes, Keith)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (jln, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to PennWell Corporation (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Richard Paul Liebowitz (jln, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Paul Martinka (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against PennWell Corporation (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1972439) by Paul Martinka (With attachments) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinka v. PennWell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Martinka
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennWell Corporation
Represented By: Keith A Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?