Adams v. Eagle Road Oil LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Adams
Defendant: Enervest Operating, L.L.C, Cummings Oil Company, Eagle Road Oil LLC, John Doe, Territory Resources, LLC, Petroquest Energy, L.L.C, Trinity Operating (USG) LLC and Petro Warrior, L.L.C
Case Number: 4:2018cv00568
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk re: remand (sac, Dpty Clk)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #108 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , lifting the stay, remanding case (terminates case) (Re: #98 Opinion and Order,,,, Remanding Case,,,, Ruling on Motion to Remand,,, #104 Order, Reopening Case,, Ruling on Motion to Stay, #99 Judgment ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE Regarding Appeal by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (With attachments) (Blythe, Michele)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER from Circuit Court Petitioner's motion to reconsider is construed as a petition for panel rehearing, and so construed, the petition is denied (Re: Remark ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER from Circuit Court denying petition for permission to appeal (Re: Remark ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Remark: mailed a copy of #104 Order to the Court Clerk of Pawnee County District Court at: Clerk, Pawnee County Court 500 Harrison St. # 300 Pawnee, OK 74058 (Re: #104 Order, Reopening Case,, Ruling on Motion to Stay ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; reopening case; granting #101 Motion to Stay (Re: #98 Opinion and Order,,,, Remanding Case,,,, Ruling on Motion to Remand,,, ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion byTrinity for Expedited Motion for Stay of Remand Order Pending Appeal (Re: #101 MOTION to Stay Expedited ) by James Adams ; (Marshall, Curt)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Expediting the response deadline to Defendant Trinity Operating's Expedited Motion for Stay or Remand Order Pending Appeal [Doc. 101] to Friday, August 9, 2019. No replies shall be filed., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 8/9/2019) (Re: #101 MOTION to Stay Expedited ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION to Stay Expedited by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Blythe, Michele)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Remark: Petition for permission to appeal under 1453(c) was filed in the 10th Circuit on 8/6/19 and assigned case number 19-604 (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk re: remand (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #99 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JUDGMENT by Judge Gregory K Frizzell - Judgment of Remand to the District Court for Pawnee County, Oklahoma (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; remanding case (terminates case) ; granting #46 Motion to Remand (Documents Terminated: #42 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief, #6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Petition and Brief in Support (filed in State Court), #5 Partial MOTION to Strike to strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Petition and Brief in Support (filed in State Court) , #80 MOTION to Dismiss Party PetroQuest Energy, LLC , #69 MOTION to Dismiss , #49 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Petition, #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 70 JOINDER in Motion, #43 JOINDER in Motion, #50 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) by James Adams ; (With attachments) (Poynter, Scott)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Plaintiffs are granted until 7/8/19 to file a reply to their motion to remand [Doc. 46] ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Replies due by 7/8/2019); granting #95 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) by James Adams (Poynter, Scott)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Counsel for Defendant Trinity Operating is directed to provide a three-ring binder notebook for use by the Court containing a paper copy of the document, with exhibits under their respective tab numbered position, as filed at Doc. 93. Said paper copy shall be a complete and exact duplicate of the filing after it was filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. (Re: #93 Response in Opposition to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC ; (With attachments) (Blythe, Michele)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) by James Adams ; (Poynter, Scott)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) by Enervest Operating, L.L.C ; (Castro, Greg)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE regarding Dismissal, dismissing Defendant Petroquest, dismissing All Claims in Plaintiffs' Operative Complaint, (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by James Adams (Poynter, Scott) Modified on 5/21/2019 to change text to more accurately reflect event (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell extending Defendant EnerVest's deadline to file a Response to 5/24/2019 ; granting #88 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Remand (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) by Enervest Operating, L.L.C (Castro, Greg)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell extending Defendant EnerVest's deadline to file a Response to 5/20/2019; Repy due by 6/10/2019 ; granting #86 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Remand (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) by Enervest Operating, L.L.C (Castro, Greg)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): Extending Defendant Trinity Operating's deadline ( Responses due by 6/12/2019, Replies due by 6/26/2019); granting #84 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Blythe, Michele)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 5/21/2019, Replies due by 6/4/2019); granting #82 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #80 MOTION to Dismiss Party PetroQuest Energy, LLC ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #80 MOTION to Dismiss Party PetroQuest Energy, LLC ) by James Adams (Marshall, Curt)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): as to Motion for Remand ( Responses due by 5/13/2019, Replies due by 5/28/2019); denying in part #54 Motion to Stay (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss Party PetroQuest Energy, LLC by Petroquest Energy, L.L.C (Randolph, John)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC ; (Blythe, Michele)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Replies due by 4/1/2019); granting #77 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Blythe, Michele)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Trinity's Motion to Stay as MOOT (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) by James Adams ; (Poynter, Scott)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #74 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #69 MOTION to Dismiss ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Strike Class Allegations by Petro Warrior (Re: #69 MOTION to Dismiss ) by James Adams (Marshall, Curt)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 2/25/2019, Replies due by 3/11/2019); granting #72 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion While Parties Attempt to Resolve Motion to Stay (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) by James Adams (Poynter, Scott)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Petro Warrior, L.L.C to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this document contains two motion-type events of which only one was efiled; Correction: efiled Joinder in Motion(s) 5 and 50 - see 70 (Re: #69 MOTION to Dismiss ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 JOINDER in Motion (submitted as part of #69 ) (Re: #5 Partial MOTION to Strike to strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Petition and Brief in Support (filed in State Court) , #50 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations ) by Petro Warrior, L.L.C (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss by Petro Warrior, L.L.C (Henson, Trevor)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Petro Warrior, L.L.C (Henson, Trevor)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Trevor Ray Henson on behalf of Petro Warrior, L.L.C [Note: Attorney Trevor Ray Henson added to party Petro Warrior, L.L.C (pty:dft).] (Henson, Trevor)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 2/11/2019, Replies due by 2/25/2019); granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Change of Address by Scott Emory Poynter by on behalf of James Adams (Poynter, Scott)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (UNOPPOSED) (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) by James Adams (Poynter, Scott)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE in Support of Motion (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) by Enervest Operating, L.L.C ; (Castro, Greg)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 2/3/2019, Replies due by 2/17/2019); granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 27, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Stay by Trinity Operating (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) by James Adams (Marshall, Curt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 60 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Allen Reese on behalf of Cummings Oil Company [Note: Attorney Jason Allen Reese added to party Cummings Oil Company(pty:dft).] (Reese, Jason)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #58 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #43 JOINDER in Motion, #49 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Petition, #42 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief, #50 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #43 JOINDER in Motion, #49 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Petition, #42 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief, #50 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations ) by James Adams (Marshall, Curt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 57 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Curt Douglas Marshall on behalf of James Adams (Marshall, Curt)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); finding as moot 55 Motion for Hearing (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 17, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this is a two-part motion of which only one part was efiled; Correction: efiled Motion for Hearing - see 55 (Re: #54 MOTION to Stay ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for Hearing Expedited (submitted as part of #54 ) by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Stay by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Blythe, Michele) Modified on 12/17/2018; this is a two-part motion of which only one part was efiled - see 55 for Motion for Hearing (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 1/9/2019, Replies due by 1/23/2019); granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 13, 2018 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Blythe, Michele)
December 4, 2018 Filing 51 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Kenneth Stonecipher on behalf of Enervest Operating, L.L.C [Note: Attorney Mark Kenneth Stonecipher added to party Enervest Operating, L.L.C (pty:dft).] (Stonecipher, Mark)
December 4, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations by Enervest Operating, L.L.C (Castro, Greg)
December 4, 2018 Filing 49 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Petition by Enervest Operating, L.L.C (Castro, Greg)
December 4, 2018 Filing 48 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Enervest Operating, L.L.C (Castro, Greg)
December 3, 2018 Filing 47 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #46 MOTION to Remand ) by James Adams ; (Ellington, Billy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION to Remand by James Adams (Ellington, Billy)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Motion to Admit Attorneys Curt D. Marshall and Scott E. Poynter to Practice Pro Hac Vice ; granting #40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 30, 2018 Filing 44 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Territory Resources, LLC (Stein, Patrick)
November 30, 2018 Filing 43 JOINDER in Motion (Re: #5 Partial MOTION to Strike to strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Petition and Brief in Support (filed in State Court) ) by Territory Resources, LLC (Stein, Patrick)
November 30, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief by Territory Resources, LLC (With attachments) (Stein, Patrick)
November 30, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (With attachments) (Blythe, Michele)
November 29, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for Attorney(s) Curt D. Marshall and Scott E. Poynter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1986815) by James Adams (Ellington, Billy)
November 19, 2018 Filing 39 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D Morfey on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Morfey, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Filing 38 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher Eric Shephard on behalf of Enervest Operating, L.L.C [Note: Attorney Christopher Eric Shephard added to party Enervest Operating, L.L.C (pty:dft).] (Shephard, Christopher)
November 15, 2018 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent EnerVest, Ltd. for Enervest Operating, L.L.C ) by Enervest Operating, L.L.C (Castro, Greg)
November 15, 2018 Filing 36 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Greg Albert Castro on behalf of Enervest Operating, L.L.C (Castro, Greg)
November 15, 2018 Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Enervest Operating, L.L.C to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 14, 2018 Filing 34 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michele R Blythe on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Blythe, Michele)
November 14, 2018 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing PetroQuest Energy, L.L.C. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Granting Defendant Enervest Operating, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise plead until December 4, 2018 ; granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 13, 2018 Filing 31 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Class Action Petition (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Enervest Operating, L.L.C [Note: Attorney Greg Albert Castro added to party Enervest Operating, L.L.C (pty:dft).] (With attachments) (Castro, Greg)
November 12, 2018 Filing 30 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to PetroQuest Energy, L.L.C. by Petroquest Energy, L.L.C (Randolph, John)
November 12, 2018 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent USG Energy Gas Producers Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Marketing, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Resources, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent NextEra Energy, Inc. for Trinity Operating (USG) LLC) by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Anderson, Pamela)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. The motion to strike, motion for dismissal and motion to remand (due 12/3/18) should first be resolved (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Cummings' Motion to Strike and Partial Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #26] is Granted. Plaintiff shall file his motion to remand by December 3, 2018. Responses to the motion to strike #5 and partial motion to dismiss #6 shall be filed 30 days after the Court enters a decision on the motion to remand. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 12/3/2018); granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #5 Partial MOTION to Strike to strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Petition and Brief in Support (filed in State Court) , #6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Petition and Brief in Support (filed in State Court) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #5 Partial MOTION to Strike to strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Petition and Brief in Support (filed in State Court) , #6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Petition and Brief in Support (filed in State Court) ) by James Adams (Ellington, Billy)
November 8, 2018 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Billy Joe Ellington on behalf of James Adams (Ellington, Billy)
November 8, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth H Blakley by on behalf of Cummings Oil Company (Blakley, Kenneth)
November 8, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jacqueline Gayle Stone by on behalf of Cummings Oil Company (Stone, Jacqueline)
November 8, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Robin Lynn Greenwald, Curt Douglas Marshall, Scott Emory Poynter, Christa Sullivan, and Travis Brown to file by November 29, 2018 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2018 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cummings Oil Company (Stone, Jacqueline)
November 8, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Territory Resources, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
November 7, 2018 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Territory Resources, LLC (Stein, Patrick)
November 7, 2018 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Cummings Oil Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline for Defendant Territory Resources, LLC: 11/30/2018) ; granting #14 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin Todd Woolery on behalf of Territory Resources, LLC (Woolery, Justin)
November 6, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick L Stein on behalf of Territory Resources, LLC (Stein, Patrick)
November 6, 2018 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Petition (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Territory Resources, LLC (Stein, Patrick)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline for Defendant Trinity Operating (USG) LLC: 11/30/2018) ; granting #10 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Nate Steel, Alex T Gray, and Jeremy Hutchinson to file by November 27, 2018 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Trinity Operating (USG) LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Class Action Petition (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Anderson, Pamela)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James C T Hardwick on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Hardwick, James)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pamela S Anderson on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Anderson, Pamela)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J Kevin Hayes on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Hayes, J)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Counsel for Defendant Trinity Operating is directed to provide a three-ring binder notebook for use by the Court containing a paper copy of the document, with tabbed exhibits, as filed at Doc. 2. Said paper copy shall be a complete and exact duplicate of the filing after it was filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Anderson, Pamela)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from District Court of Pawnee County, case number CJ-2016-00078 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1977853) by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (With attachments) (Anderson, Pamela)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Trinity Operating (USG) LLC (Anderson, Pamela)
August 27, 2018 Amended PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by James Adams (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Eagle Road Oil LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enervest Operating, L.L.C
Represented By: Christopher Eric Shephard
Represented By: Mark Kenneth Stonecipher
Represented By: Greg Albert Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummings Oil Company
Represented By: Kenneth H Blakley
Represented By: Christa Sullivan
Represented By: Jacqueline Gayle Stone
Represented By: Travis Brown
Represented By: Jason Allen Reese
Represented By: Travis Walter Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Road Oil LLC
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Pittman
Represented By: Steven Joseph Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Territory Resources, LLC
Represented By: Justin Todd Woolery
Represented By: Patrick L Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petroquest Energy, L.L.C
Represented By: Robert J Winter
Represented By: John Louis Randolph, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Operating (USG) LLC
Represented By: J Kevin Hayes
Represented By: Michele R Blythe
Represented By: Pamela S Anderson
Represented By: James C T Hardwick
Represented By: Michael D Morfey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Warrior, L.L.C
Represented By: Trevor Ray Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Adams
Represented By: Billy Joe Ellington
Represented By: Jeremy Hutchinson
Represented By: Scott Emory Poynter
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Alex T Gray
Represented By: Nate Steel
Represented By: Curt Douglas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?