Glover et al v. Mercogliano et al

Plaintiff: Willette Glover and Willie T Houston
Defendant: Robert Mercogliano, Micheal Kleinman, Alive Natural Sounds, Fred James, George Lawhorn, Fat Possum, Carla Jordan, Apple iTunes, Apple Inc., Connie Mercogliano, Tracey Stokes, William Thomas, Alive Records, LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc. and Fat Possum Records, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00581
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION to Strike Document(s) (Re: #67 Notice of Dismissal ) by Micheal Kleinman (Haskins, Walter)
January 9, 2019 Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for BMI Records be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #81 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
January 9, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by BMI Records (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong filer; Correction: corrected filer (Re: #80 Notice of Dismissal ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Tracey Stokes, (Re: #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 1/8/2019 to correct filer (dlg, Dpty Clk).
January 8, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing William Thomas, (Re: #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Apple iTunes be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #77 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
January 8, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Apple iTunes (Luthey, Graydon)
January 4, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Fred James ; (Jayne, Andrew)
January 4, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Fred James (Jayne, Andrew)
January 2, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #61 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Willette Glover ; (sc, Dpty Clk)
January 2, 2019 Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER , directing BMI Records to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 72 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Connie Mercogliano, Robert Mercogliano (jln, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #70 Response in Opposition to Motion, #69 Response in Opposition to Motion, #68 Response in Opposition to Motion ) by Willette Glover (jln, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Willette Glover ; (jln, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Willette Glover ; (jln, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong filer selected (Robert Mercogliano); Correction: edited docket text to reflect correct filer (Willette Glover) (Re: #68 Response in Opposition to Motion ) (jln, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Willette Glover; (jln, Dpty Clk) Modified on 12/28/2018 to correct filer (jln, Dpty Clk).
December 28, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Micheal Kleinman, (Re: #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (jln, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMI Records (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
December 28, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by BMI Records (With attachments) (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
December 28, 2018 Filing 64 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Calvin Hendrickson on behalf of BMI Records [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Calvin Hendrickson added to party BMI Records(pty:dft).] (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Micheal Kleinman (With attachments) (Haskins, Walter)
December 26, 2018 Filing 62 JOINDER in Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) by Tracey Stokes (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 26, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss by William Thomas (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 26, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss by Tracey Stokes (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting admission pro hac vice for attorneys Anna Kurian Shaw, Lauren Beth Cury and Clayton C. James ; adding attorney Clayton C James,Lauren Beth Cury for Apple iTunes ; granting #51 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #52 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Fat Possum be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #56 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Alive Natural Sounds be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #55 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Fat Possum (Shephard, Christopher) (Main Document 56 replaced on 12/20/2018: replaced blank PDF) (sc, Dpty Clk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Alive Natural Sounds (Shephard, Christopher) (Main Document 55 replaced on 12/20/2018: replaced blank PDF) (sc, Dpty Clk).
December 20, 2018 Filing 54 PRO HAC VICE FEES Paid for attorney(s) Anna Kurian Shaw, Lauren Beth Cury, Clayton C James in the amount of $150.00 (Re: #53 MOTION for Attorney(s) Clayton C. James to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice , #51 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anna Kurian Shaw to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice , #52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lauren Beth Cury to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice ) by Apple iTunes (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION for Attorney(s) Clayton C. James to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Apple iTunes (With attachments) (Luthey, Graydon)
December 20, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lauren Beth Cury to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Apple iTunes (With attachments) (Luthey, Graydon)
December 20, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anna Kurian Shaw to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Apple iTunes (With attachments) (Luthey, Graydon)
December 20, 2018 Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Alive Natural Sounds to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
December 19, 2018 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple iTunes (Luthey, Graydon)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Motions to Dismiss have been filed and should first be resolved. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 19, 2018 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fat Possum (Castro, Greg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alive Natural Sounds (Castro, Greg)
December 18, 2018 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Micheal Kleinman (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Connie Mercogliano, Robert Mercogliano (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: William Thomas (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Fat Possum (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Apple iTunes (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: George Lawhorn (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Carla Jordan (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: BMI Records (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Fred James (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted re: Amazon Music (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted re: Apple iTunes (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Alive Natural Sounds (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: BMI Records (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted re: Carla Jordan (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Connie Mercogliano, Robert Mercogliano (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Micheal Kleinman (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: George Lawhorn (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Fat Possum (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 27 JOINDER in Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) by Carla Jordan (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline set: 1/16/2019) ; granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by Carla Jordan (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kirsten L Palfreyman on behalf of Micheal Kleinman (Palfreyman, Kirsten)
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer First (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Alive Natural Sounds, Fat Possum (Castro, Greg)
December 17, 2018 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Greg Albert Castro on behalf of Alive Natural Sounds, Fat Possum [Note: Attorney Greg Albert Castro added to party Alive Natural Sounds(pty:dft), Attorney Greg Albert Castro added to party Fat Possum(pty:dft).] (Castro, Greg)
December 17, 2018 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher Eric Shephard on behalf of Alive Natural Sounds, Fat Possum [Note: Attorney Christopher Eric Shephard added to party Alive Natural Sounds(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Eric Shephard added to party Fat Possum(pty:dft).] (Shephard, Christopher)
December 17, 2018 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Walter Dewey Haskins, III on behalf of Micheal Kleinman (Haskins, Walter)
December 14, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER , directing Apple iTunes to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 13, 2018 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tara Dawn Zickefoose on behalf of Fred James [Note: Attorney Tara Dawn Zickefoose added to party Fred James(pty:dft).] (Zickefoose, Tara)
December 13, 2018 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Charles Jayne on behalf of Fred James (Jayne, Andrew)
December 13, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Fred James [Note: Attorney Andrew Charles Jayne added to party Fred James(pty:dft).] (With attachments) (Jayne, Andrew)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline set 1/16/2019) ; granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to First Amended Complaint (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Apple iTunes (Luthey, Graydon)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr on behalf of Apple iTunes [Note: Attorney Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr added to party Apple iTunes(pty:dft).] (Luthey, Graydon)
December 10, 2018 ***Motion(s) Referred to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: #12 MOTION for Discovery to Depose Plaintiff Willette Glover and Shanika Cursh ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Discovery to Depose Plaintiff Willette Glover and Shanika Cursh by Micheal Kleinman (With attachments) (Haskins, Walter)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Micheal Kleinman [Note: Attorney Walter Dewey Haskins, III added to party Micheal Kleinman(pty:dft).] (With attachments) (Haskins, Walter)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Alive Natural Sounds, Amazon Music, Apple iTunes, BMI Records, Fat Possum, Fred James, Carla Jordan, Micheal Kleinman, George Lawhorn, Connie Mercogliano, Robert Mercogliano, William Thomas (jln, Dpty Clk)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Willette Glover (jln, Dpty Clk)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Carla Jordan (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Robert Mercogliano (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Willette Glover (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Having reviewed the plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis [Doc. 2], the document utilized is not the proper form. Because the plaintiffs are not prisoners, they must utilize Form CV-04 (4/09), which can be found on the public website for the United States District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma, oknd.uscourts.gov. As the court has not been provided with the required financial information for a civil pro se litigant, the plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis [Doc. 2] is denied without prejudice. The plaintiffs may again seek leave to file the action without payment of fees or costs by fully completing, by November 30, 2018, the Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Supporting Affidavit (CV-04 (4/09)). Otherwise, the plaintiffs are advised this action will be dismissed without prejudice unless the plaintiffs pay the full $400.00 filing fee within twenty days of this order. ; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKF1, Chambers)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alive Natural Sounds, Apple iTunes, Fat Possum, Fred James, Carla Jordan, Micheal Kleinman, George Lawhorn, Robert Mercogliano by Willette Glover (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover et al v. Mercogliano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willette Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie T Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mercogliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Kleinman
Represented By: Walter Dewey Haskins, III
Represented By: Kirsten L Palfreyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alive Natural Sounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred James
Represented By: Andrew Charles Jayne
Represented By: Tara Dawn Zickefoose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Lawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fat Possum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple iTunes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Beth Cury
Represented By: Clayton C James
Represented By: Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr
Represented By: Anna Kurian Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Mercogliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alive Records, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Eric Shephard
Represented By: Greg Albert Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Calvin Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fat Possum Records, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Eric Shephard
Represented By: Greg Albert Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?