Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Reincke

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Rising Gorge Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Welsh Witch Music, Nashville Star Music, Kenny O'Dell Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Carnival Music Company, Galeneye Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Just Friends Music and Al Green Music, Inc.
Defendant: Edward L Reincke
Case Number: 4:2018cv00603
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 8/1/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/3/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Terence Kern, Jury Trial set for 1/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern) (srt, Dpty Clk)
January 14, 2019 Filing 28 Agreed JOINT STATUS REPORT by Al Green Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Galeneye Music, Just Friends Music, Nashville Star Music, Rising Gorge Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/15/2019 to remove terminated filer selected in error (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
January 9, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #21 Amended Complaint, ) by Edward L Reincke (Millikin, Margaret)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc. 25) is GRANTED. Defendant's answer is due 1/9/2019. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/9/2019); granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lmc, Chambers)
December 13, 2018 Filing 25 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint,, #21 Amended Complaint, ) by Edward L Reincke (Millikin, Margaret)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/14/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
December 13, 2018 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Margaret Susan Millikin on behalf of Edward L Reincke [Note: Attorney Margaret Susan Millikin added to party Edward L Reincke(pty:dft).] (Millikin, Margaret)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: terminated plaintiff selected as a filer; Correction: removed terminated plaintiff as a filer (Re: #22 Summons Returned Executed, ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
December 7, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Edward L Reincke (Re: #2 Complaint,, ) by Rondor Music International, Inc., Galeneye Music, Welsh Witch Music, Nashville Star Music, Just Friends Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Rising Gorge Music, Al Green Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (With attachments) (Sharrock, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/10/2018 to remove filer selected in error (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Edward L Reincke (Re: #2 Complaint,, ) by Rondor Music International, Inc., Galeneye Music, Welsh Witch Music, Nashville Star Music, Just Friends Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Rising Gorge Music, Kenny O'Dell Music, Al Green Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nashville Star Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carnival Music Company (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Just Friends Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Galeneye Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Al Green Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC) by Sony/ATV Songs LLC (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent EMI Group Global, LTD for EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.) by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rising Gorge Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International, Inc.) by Rondor Music International, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Welsh Witch Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC) by Sony/ATV Songs LLC (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent EMI Group Global, LTD for EMI Blackwood Music Inc.) by EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Edward L Reincke (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (jln, Dpty Clk)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Welsh Witch Music, Just Friends Music, Kenny O'Dell Music, Galeneye Music, Al Green Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Rising Gorge Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Nashville Star Music and Carnival Music Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles Andrew Schreck on behalf of Broadcast Music, Inc. (Schreck, Charles)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Rose Sharrock on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Edward L Reincke (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1983777) by Rondor Music International, Inc., Galeneye Music, Welsh Witch Music, Nashville Star Music, Just Friends Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Rising Gorge Music, Kenny O'Dell Music, Al Green Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/26/2018 to add receipt information(jln, Dpty Clk).
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Al Green Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Galeneye Music, Just Friends Music, Kenny O'Dell Music, Nashville Star Music, Rising Gorge Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Reincke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rising Gorge Music
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nashville Star Music
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny O'Dell Music
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc.
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnival Music Company
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galeneye Music
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Just Friends Music
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Green Music, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward L Reincke
Represented By: Margaret Susan Millikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?