Hines v. CHW Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cynthia Hines
Defendant: CHW Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00626
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The Court is in receipt of the notice of settlement (Dkt. # 6). The parties are directed to file their fully-executed joint stipulation of dismissal no later than 1/18/2019., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 1/18/2019) (Re: #6 Notice of Settlement, #1 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Cynthia Hines (Agruss, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CHW Group, Inc. (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Cynthia Hines (Agruss, Michael)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cynthia Hines (Agruss, Michael)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CHW Group, Inc. (dlg, Dpty Clk)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elaine Michele Dowling on behalf of Cynthia Hines (Dowling, Elaine)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHW Group, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1985416) by Cynthia Hines (With attachments) (Agruss, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. CHW Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHW Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hines
Represented By: Michael S Agruss
Represented By: Elaine Michele Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?