Heiliger v. Grant & Weber, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bryant Heiliger
Defendant: Grant & Weber, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00635
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 9) is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is due January 30, 2019. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/30/2019); granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Grant & Weber, Inc. (George, Lysbeth)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 2/4/2019) (SAS, Chambers)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 6) is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed by January 16, 2019. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/16/2019); granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Grant & Weber, Inc. (George, Lysbeth)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lysbeth Lou George on behalf of Grant & Weber, Inc. [Note: Attorney Lysbeth Lou George added to party Grant & Weber, Inc.(pty:dft).] (George, Lysbeth)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew E Henry on behalf of Grant & Weber, Inc. [Note: Attorney Andrew E Henry added to party Grant & Weber, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Henry, Andrew)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Grant & Weber, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Grant & Weber, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1987221) by Bryant Heiliger (Wandres, Victor)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bryant Heiliger (Wandres, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heiliger v. Grant & Weber, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Heiliger
Represented By: Victor R Wandres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant & Weber, Inc.
Represented By: Lysbeth Lou George
Represented By: Andrew E Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?