DriverReach, LLC v. Tenstreet, LLC

Plaintiff: DriverReach, LLC
Defendant: Tenstreet, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00650
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew Kent Felty on behalf of DriverReach, LLC [Note: Attorney Matthew Kent Felty added to party DriverReach, LLC(pty:pla).] (Felty, Matthew)
January 29, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Spectrum Equity VII, LP for Tenstreet, LLC) by Tenstreet, LLC (Tucker, Colin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Tenstreet, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 2/25/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
January 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tenstreet, LLC (Tucker, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John H Tucker on behalf of Tenstreet, LLC [Note: Attorney John H Tucker added to party Tenstreet, LLC(pty:dft).] (Tucker, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Colin Hampton Tucker on behalf of Tenstreet, LLC [Note: Attorney Colin Hampton Tucker added to party Tenstreet, LLC(pty:dft).] (Tucker, Colin)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; terminating attorney Leslie B Hayden ; granting #14 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Leslie B. Hayden as Counsel of Record by DriverReach, LLC (With attachments) (Hayden, Leslie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Tenstreet, LLC (Re: #1 Complaint ) by DriverReach, LLC (With attachments) (Mullins, Steven)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that counsel Louis T. Perry, Leslie B. Hayden, Elizabeth M.C. Scheibel, and Andrew M. McCoy are admitted pro hac vice for the limited purpose of representing plaintiff in this matter. ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) 1 to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Andrew McCoy) (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1993643) by DriverReach, LLC (With attachments) (Mullins, Steven)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) 1 to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Elizabeth Scheibel) (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1993640) by DriverReach, LLC (With attachments) (Mullins, Steven)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) 1 to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Leslie Hayden) (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1993625) by DriverReach, LLC (With attachments) (Mullins, Steven)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) 1 to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Louis Perry) (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1993600) by DriverReach, LLC (With attachments) (Mullins, Steven)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Andrew M McCoy, Louis T Perry, Leslie B Hayden, and Eizabeth Scheibel to file by 01/03/2019 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tenstreet, LLC (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER , directing DriverReach, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by DriverReach, LLC (Mullins, Steven)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Saber Holdings, Inc. for DriverReach, LLC) by DriverReach, LLC (Mullins, Steven)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven K Mullins on behalf of DriverReach, LLC (Mullins, Steven)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tenstreet, LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1992114) by DriverReach, LLC (Mullins, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DriverReach, LLC v. Tenstreet, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DriverReach, LLC
Represented By: Leslie B Hayden
Represented By: Steven K Mullins
Represented By: Elizabeth Scheibel
Represented By: Louis T Perry
Represented By: Andrew M McCoy
Represented By: Matthew Kent Felty
Represented By: Elizabeth MC Scheibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenstreet, LLC
Represented By: Colin Hampton Tucker
Represented By: John H Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?