U.S. Bank National Association v. Nichols et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Tonnie Chicke Nichols, Boris Bernard Nichols, State of Oklahoma, Jane Doe, John Doe, United States of America and First Fidelity Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00040
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 EXHIBIT(S) (Thumbdrive) (Re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion ) by Boris Bernard Nichols, Tonnie Chicke Nichols (dlg, Dpty Clk)
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court ) by Boris Bernard Nichols, Tonnie Chicke Nichols ; (dlg, Dpty Clk)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by State of Oklahoma (With attachments) (McFarland, Sean)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sean R McFarland on behalf of State of Oklahoma [Note: Attorney Sean R McFarland added to party State of Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (McFarland, Sean)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendants Tonnie Chicke Nichols's and Boris Bernard Nichols's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. 3) is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Action to State Court (Doc. 8) by February 21, 2019. Plaintiff's shall reply by March 7, 2019. ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Re: #8 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association) by U.S. Bank National Association (Parrott, Blake)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court by U.S. Bank National Association (Parrott, Blake)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Blake C Parrott on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association [Note: Attorney Blake C Parrott added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:pla).] (Parrott, Blake)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Gary D Baer, William H Sullivan, Kim Jenkins, Chynna Scruggs, Nicholas L Massey, and Megan A Winter to file by 2/21/2019 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing U.S. Bank National Association, First Fidelity Bank, N.A. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Tonnie Chicke Nichols (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa Cty Dist Ct, case number CJ-17-1957 by Boris Bernard Nichols, Tonnie Chicke Nichols (dlg, Dpty Clk)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Boris Bernard Nichols, Tonnie Chicke Nichols (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 19, 2017 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Jane Doe, John Doe, First Fidelity Bank, N.A., Boris Bernard Nichols, Tonnie Chicke Nichols, State of Oklahoma, United States of America by U.S. Bank National Association (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Nichols et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonnie Chicke Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boris Bernard Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Megan A Winter
Represented By: Sean R McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey Andrew Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Fidelity Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Everette Chandler Altdoerffer
Represented By: Leah Clark
Represented By: Stephen L Bruce
Represented By: Nicholas L Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Chynna Scruggs
Represented By: Kim Jenkins
Represented By: Donald J Timberlake
Represented By: Gary D Baer
Represented By: Blake C Parrott
Represented By: William H Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?