Warner v. Jenny Craig, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cheryl Warner
Defendant: Jenny Craig, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00080
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
0 Judge: John E Dowdell
1 Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Court is in receipt of Plaintif's Notice of Settlement. Dismissal papers shall be filed on or before May 7, 2019., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 5/7/2019) (Re: #5 Notice of Settlement ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Cheryl Warner (Lemberg, Sergei)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jenny Craig, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Sergei Lemberg (dlg, Dpty Clk)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jenny Craig, Inc. (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2014742) by Cheryl Warner (Lemberg, Sergei)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cheryl Warner (Lemberg, Sergei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Jenny Craig, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Warner
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Craig, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?