WB Music Corp. et al v. Fur Shop LLC

Plaintiff: Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Stereo Supersonic Music, Edwin H. Morris & Co., Inc., Jordan Rocks Music, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Lit Up Music and WB Music Corp.
Defendant: Fur Shop, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00101
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #9 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Fur Shop, LLC by Edwin H. Morris & Co., Inc., Jordan Rocks Music, Lit Up Music, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Stereo Supersonic Music, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. (With attachments) (Stiner, John)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Fur Shop, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Edwin H. Morris & Co., Inc., Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Stereo Supersonic Music, Lit Up Music, WB Music Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Jordan Rocks Music (Stiner, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (jln, Dpty Clk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing WB Music Corp., Jordan Rocks Music, Stereo Supersonic Music, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Lit Up Music, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc. and Edwin H. Morris & Co., Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Fur Shop, LLC (jln, Dpty Clk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure Stmt by Edwin H. Morris & Co., Inc., Jordan Rocks Music, Lit Up Music, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Stereo Supersonic Music, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. (Stiner, John) Modified on 2/26/2019 to change text to reflect correct event (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Douglas Stiner on behalf of Edwin H. Morris & Co., Inc., Jordan Rocks Music, Lit Up Music, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Stereo Supersonic Music, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. (Stiner, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Fur Shop, LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2020543) by Edwin H. Morris & Co., Inc., Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Stereo Supersonic Music, Lit Up Music, WB Music Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Jordan Rocks Music (With attachments) (Stiner, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Edwin H. Morris & Co., Inc., Jordan Rocks Music, Lit Up Music, Ray Vaughan Music, Inc., Stereo Supersonic Music, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. (Stiner, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WB Music Corp. et al v. Fur Shop LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stereo Supersonic Music
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin H. Morris & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Rocks Music
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Vaughan Music, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lit Up Music
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Music Corp.
Represented By: Stacy R Obenhaus
Represented By: Abigail Drake
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fur Shop, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?