Sanford v. Drivenforce, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tracie L Sanford
Defendant: Drivenforce, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00116
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ Randall J. Snapp ( Settlement Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 09:30 AM before Adjunct Judge) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion to Dismiss (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 9/10/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 9/24/2019, Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/30/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 1/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Drivenforce, Inc. (Bru, Courtney)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Support of Motion (Re: #4 Partial MOTION to Dismiss ) by Tracie L Sanford ; (Coulter, Jean)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Drivenforce, Inc. (Bru, Courtney)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 3/26/2019) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Drivenforce, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Drivenforce, Inc. (Bru, Courtney)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Drivenforce, Inc. (Bru, Courtney)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Drivenforce, Inc. (Bru, Courtney)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2019-538 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2023959) by Drivenforce, Inc. (With attachments) (Bru, Courtney)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Drivenforce, Inc. (Bru, Courtney)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Courtney L Bru on behalf of Drivenforce, Inc. (Bru, Courtney)
February 7, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Drivenforce, Inc. by Tracie L Sanford (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanford v. Drivenforce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drivenforce, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney L Bru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie L Sanford
Represented By: Jean Walpole Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?