Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Gibb Brothers Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., No Surrender Music and Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Defendant: Todd Richard Billingsley, Kris Parchuri, Patience Jay Jones, PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC and Jess Daniel Jones
Case Number: 4:2019cv00117
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Todd Richard Billingsley, Jess Daniel Jones, PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC (sc, Dpty Clk)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eleksylum Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Patience Jay Jones, Kris Parchuri (dlg, Dpty Clk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles Andrew Schreck on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schreck, Charles)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (dlg, Dpty Clk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs. Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Gibb Brothers Music, Crompton Songs, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Eleksylum Music, Inc., No Surrender Music to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Rose Sharrock on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2024085) by Gibb Brothers Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Eleksylum Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., No Surrender Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., Gibb Brothers Music, No Surrender Music, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crompton Songs
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibb Brothers Music
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleksylum Music, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No Surrender Music
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Charles Andrew Schreck
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Sharrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Richard Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Parchuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patience Jay Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJ's Pub & Grill, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Daniel Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?