Ray et al v. Riverport Apartments LLC et al
Plaintiff: Billy Tyler Ray and Samantha Ray
Defendant: Marie Mullins, Saeed Shawn Azarrafiy and Riverport Apartments LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00195
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #32 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
August 12, 2020 Filing 32 JUDGMENT by Judge Terence Kern of Dismissal without prejudice, entering judgment in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendants (terminates case) (lmc, Chambers)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) ; granting #29 Motion to Dismiss (Documents Terminated: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims, #18 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Response In Opposition to Defendant Marie Mullins Reply, #25 MOTION to Amend Complaint, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Samantha Ray's Claims, #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims ) (lmc, Chambers)
May 14, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Saeed Shawn Azarrafiy, Marie Mullins, Riverport Apartments LLC ; (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
April 1, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Billy Tyler Ray, Samantha Ray (Salmon, Caleb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #25 MOTION to Amend Complaint ) by Billy Tyler Ray, Samantha Ray ; (Salmon, Caleb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #25 MOTION to Amend Complaint ) by Saeed Shawn Azarrafiy, Marie Mullins, Riverport Apartments LLC ; (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
October 10, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims ) by Saeed Shawn Azarrafiy, Marie Mullins, Riverport Apartments LLC ; (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Billy Tyler Ray, Samantha Ray (With attachments) (Salmon, Caleb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims ) by Billy Tyler Ray, Samantha Ray ; (Salmon, Caleb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Caleb Matthew Salmon on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Caleb Matthew Salmon added to party Billy Tyler Ray(pty:pla), Attorney Caleb Matthew Salmon added to party Samantha Ray(pty:pla).] (Salmon, Caleb)
September 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims by Saeed Shawn Azarrafiy (With attachments) (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Saeed Shawn Azarrafiy (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Samantha Ray, Billy Tyler Ray (Agosto, Shar)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case, as Defendants Riverport Apartments LLC and Marie Mullins have filed Motions to Dismiss (Doc. 11 and Doc. 12), which should first be resolved. (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Samantha Ray's Claims, #19 Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Marie Mullins, Riverport Apartments LLC (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
May 15, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Reply to Response to Motion); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Response in Opposition to Motion) (Re: #16 Reply to Response to Motion ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Response In Opposition to Defendant Marie Mullins Reply by Marie Mullins (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Samantha Ray's Claims ) by Riverport Apartments LLC ; (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 Second RESPONSE in Opposition Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims ) by Billy Tyler Ray, Samantha Ray ; (Agosto, Shar) Modified on 5/15/2019 to change text to reflect correct event (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims ) by Marie Mullins ; (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Samantha Ray's Claims ) by Billy Tyler Ray, Samantha Ray ; (Agosto, Shar)
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims ) by Billy Tyler Ray, Samantha Ray ; (Agosto, Shar)
April 18, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: filer selected in error; Correction: removed filer selected but not named in pleading (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Samantha Ray's Claims ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
April 18, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: filer selected in error; Correction: removed filer selected but not named in pleading (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims by Marie Mullins (With attachments) (Chilcoat, Kelsey) Modified on 4/18/2019 to remove filer selected in error (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Samantha Ray's Claims by Riverport Apartments LLC (With attachments) (Chilcoat, Kelsey) Modified on 4/18/2019 to remove filer selected in error (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Marie Mullins, Riverport Apartments LLC (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 5/17/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Marie Mullins, Riverport Apartments LLC (Woods, Maurice)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marie Mullins, Riverport Apartments LLC (Woods, Maurice)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Riverport Apartments LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kelsey Ann Chilcoat on behalf of Marie Mullins, Riverport Apartments LLC (Chilcoat, Kelsey)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Maurice Glenn Woods, II on behalf of Marie Mullins, Riverport Apartments LLC (Woods, Maurice)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Rogers County, case number CJ-2019-117 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2038759) by Marie Mullins, Riverport Apartments LLC (With attachments) (Woods, Maurice)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Marie Mullins, Riverport Apartments LLC (Woods, Maurice)
March 11, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Samantha Ray, Billy Tyler Ray (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray et al v. Riverport Apartments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Mullins
Represented By: Kelsey Ann Chilcoat
Represented By: Maurice Glenn Woods, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saeed Shawn Azarrafiy
Represented By: Kelsey Ann Chilcoat
Represented By: Maurice Glenn Woods, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverport Apartments LLC
Represented By: Kelsey Ann Chilcoat
Represented By: Maurice Glenn Woods, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Tyler Ray
Represented By: Shar Agosto
Represented By: Shar Fitzpatrick Agosto
Represented By: Caleb M Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Ray
Represented By: Shar Agosto
Represented By: Shar Fitzpatrick Agosto
Represented By: Caleb M Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?