Feenstra et al v. Sigler et al
Plaintiff: Sharonica Carter, Amanda Feenstra and Lonnie Feenstra
Defendant: Jared Sigler, Curtis DeLapp, Oklahoma Indigent Defense System, John Gerkin, State of Oklahoma, Craig Sutter and Oklahoma Indigent Defense System Board of Directors
Case Number: 4:2019cv00234
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support, #11 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Sharonica Carter, Amanda Feenstra, Lonnie Feenstra ; (Bryan, John)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #22 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for combined response brief by five (5) pages. by Sharonica Carter, Amanda Feenstra, Lonnie Feenstra (Terrill, Steven)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Amended Order), setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 6/21/2019, Replies due by 7/5/2019) (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support, #20 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion, ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 6/7/2019, Replies due by 6/21/2019); granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support, #11 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Sharonica Carter, Amanda Feenstra, Lonnie Feenstra (Bryan, John)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting admission pro hac vice for attorneys Michael Lacovara, Lilia Vazova, Leah Watson, and Myesha Braden ; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Myesha Braden to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2054491) by Sharonica Carter, Amanda Feenstra, Lonnie Feenstra (With attachments) (Bryan, John)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Leah Watson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2054490) by Sharonica Carter, Amanda Feenstra, Lonnie Feenstra (With attachments) (Bryan, John)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lilia Vazova to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2054488) by Sharonica Carter, Amanda Feenstra, Lonnie Feenstra (With attachments) (Bryan, John)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Lacovara to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2054485) by Sharonica Carter, Amanda Feenstra, Lonnie Feenstra (With attachments) (Bryan, John)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven James Terrill on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Steven James Terrill added to party Sharonica Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Steven James Terrill added to party Amanda Feenstra(pty:pla), Attorney Steven James Terrill added to party Lonnie Feenstra(pty:pla).] (Terrill, Steven)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Defendants' have filed Motions to Dismiss which should first be resolved. (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support, #11 MOTION to Dismiss ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Oklahoma Indigent Defense System, Oklahoma Indigent Defense System Board of Directors, State of Oklahoma, Craig Sutter (Williford, Jon)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support by Curtis DeLapp, John Gerkin, Jared Sigler (With attachments) (Lawson, Stefanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Oklahoma Indigent Defense System for Oklahoma Indigent Defense System Board of Directors) by Oklahoma Indigent Defense System, Oklahoma Indigent Defense System Board of Directors (Williford, Jon)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Oklahoma Indigent Defense System, Oklahoma Indigent Defense System Board of Directors, State of Oklahoma, Craig Sutter (Williford, Jon)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Oklahoma Indigent Defense System, Oklahoma Indigent Defense System Board of Directors, State of Oklahoma, Craig Sutter (jln, Dpty Clk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Oklahoma Indigent Defense System, Oklahoma Indigent Defense System Board of Directors to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stefanie Erin Lawson on behalf of Curtis DeLapp, John Gerkin, Jared Sigler [Note: Attorney Stefanie Erin Lawson added to party Curtis DeLapp(pty:dft), Attorney Stefanie Erin Lawson added to party John Gerkin(pty:dft), Attorney Stefanie Erin Lawson added to party Jared Sigler(pty:dft).] (Lawson, Stefanie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal by Oklahoma Indigent Defense System, Oklahoma Indigent Defense System Board of Directors, Craig Sutter (With attachments) (Williford, Jon) Modified on 5/6/2019 to delete text entered in error (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon M Williford on behalf of Oklahoma Indigent Defense System, Oklahoma Indigent Defense System Board of Directors, Craig Sutter (Williford, Jon)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Oklahoma Indigent Defense System, Oklahoma Indigent Defense System Board of Directors, Craig Sutter (Williford, Jon)
March 21, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Sharonica Carter, Amanda Feenstra, Lonnie Feenstra (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feenstra et al v. Sigler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Sigler
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis DeLapp
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Indigent Defense System
Represented By: Jon M Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gerkin
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Jon M Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Sutter
Represented By: Jon M Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Indigent Defense System Board of Directors
Represented By: Jon M Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharonica Carter
Represented By: Lilia Vazova
Represented By: John Spencer Bryan
Represented By: Leah Watson
Represented By: Myesha Braden
Represented By: Michael Lacovara
Represented By: Steven James Terrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Feenstra
Represented By: Lilia Vazova
Represented By: John Spencer Bryan
Represented By: Leah Watson
Represented By: Myesha Braden
Represented By: Michael Lacovara
Represented By: Steven James Terrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Feenstra
Represented By: Lilia Vazova
Represented By: John Spencer Bryan
Represented By: Leah Watson
Represented By: Myesha Braden
Represented By: Michael Lacovara
Represented By: Steven James Terrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?