Pittman v. Nordam Group, LLC, The
Plaintiff: Ronald Pittman
Defendant: Nordam Group, LLC, The and NORDAM Group LLC, The
Case Number: 4:2019cv00235
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 11/19/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 12/24/2019, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/21/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ronald Pittman (Smolen, Daniel)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/20/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by NORDAM Group LLC, The (Broussard, Steven)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for NORDAM Group, LLC, The be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #9 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the unopposed motion #11 is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due no later than 5/17/2019. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 5/17/2019); granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Nordam Group, LLC, The (Broussard, Steven)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Siegfried Holdings, Inc. for Nordam Group, LLC, The) by Nordam Group, LLC, The (Broussard, Steven)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Nordam Group, LLC, The (Broussard, Steven)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing The Nordam Group, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Johnathan Louis Rogers on behalf of Nordam Group, LLC, The (Rogers, Johnathan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Nordam Group, Inc., The be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #5 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Nordam Group, Inc., The (Broussard, Steven)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven Anthony Broussard on behalf of Nordam Group, Inc., The (Broussard, Steven)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Nordam Group, Inc., The (Broussard, Steven)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2018-03025 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2049241) by Nordam Group, Inc., The (With attachments) (Broussard, Steven)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Nordam Group, Inc., The (Broussard, Steven)
July 18, 2018 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Nordam Group, Inc., The by Ronald Pittman (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittman v. Nordam Group, LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordam Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Johnathan Louis Rogers
Represented By: Steven Anthony Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORDAM Group LLC, The
Represented By: Johnathan Louis Rogers
Represented By: Steven Anthony Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Pittman
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?