Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. v. Hooper et al
Plaintiff: Double Eagle Alloys, Inc.
Defendant: Michel Hooper and Ace Alloys, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00243
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support ) by Ace Alloys, LLC, Michel Hooper ; (With attachments) (Ray, Ryan)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Initial Disclosures due by 6/28/19, Discovery requests served by 6/28/19, Discovery responses and response documents produced by 7/26/19, Produce Relevant Computers for Inspection by 6/28/19, Depositions concluded by 8/16/19 and the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (dkt #18 ) is set for August 28, 2019 at 9:30 a.m., 224 S Boulder Ave, 2nd Floor Courtroom. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Discovery due by 6/28/2019, Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern); granting #20 Motion for Hearing (Re: #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support ) (srt, Dpty Clk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing (Re: #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction) on Preliminary Injunction and Schedule Regarding Same by Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. (Taylor, Jason) Modified on 6/12/2019 to create link to 18 (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hayley N Stephens on behalf of Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. [Note: Attorney Hayley N Stephens added to party Double Eagle Alloys, Inc.(pty:pla).] (Stephens, Hayley)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support by Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. (With attachments) (Taylor, Jason)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ace Alloys, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/1/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ace Alloys, LLC, Michel Hooper (Ray, Ryan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ace Alloys, LLC (Ray, Ryan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joel L Wohlgemuth on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Joel L Wohlgemuth added to party Ace Alloys, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joel L Wohlgemuth added to party Michel Hooper(pty:dft).] (Wohlgemuth, Joel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Ace Alloys, LLC, Michel Hooper [Note: Attorney Ryan A Ray added to party Ace Alloys, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan A Ray added to party Michel Hooper(pty:dft).] (Ray, Ryan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Michel Hooper (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. (Taylor, Jason)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ace Alloys, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. (Taylor, Jason)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Connie M. Kremer is admitted Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. ; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Gregory Parker Rogers is admitted Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. ; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Connie M. Kremer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2050110) by Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. (With attachments) (Taylor, Jason)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gregory Parker Rogers to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2050104) by Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. (With attachments) (Taylor, Jason)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Corrosion Materials, Inc. for Double Eagle Alloys, Inc.) by Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. (Taylor, Jason)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ace Alloys, LLC, Michel Hooper (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ace Alloys, LLC, Michel Hooper (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2049809) by Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. (Taylor, Jason)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. (Taylor, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Double Eagle Alloys, Inc. v. Hooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michel Hooper
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Represented By: Joel L Wohlgemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Alloys, LLC
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Represented By: Joel L Wohlgemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Double Eagle Alloys, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Sean Taylor
Represented By: Gregory Parker Rogers
Represented By: Hayley N Stephens
Represented By: Connie M Kremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?