Downing v. Tulsa Police Dept.
Plaintiff: Robert Gene Downing
Defendant: Tulsa Police Dept.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00258
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #8 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , entering judgment (terminates case) (pll, Dpty Clk)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) (pll, Dpty Clk)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing Plaintiff, Robert Gene Downing to show cause( Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/1/2019) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting Filing Fee deadline(s): ( Filing Fee due by 6/11/2019); denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Robert Gene Downing (jln, Dpty Clk)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Having reviewed plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs [Doc. No. 2], the document is incomplete because plaintiff did not provide the requested information in all of the relevant fields. The form instructed plaintiff "not to leave any blanks: if the answer to a question is '0,' 'none,' or 'not applicable,' write that response." As the court has not been provided with the required financial information, plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs [Doc. No. 2] is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff may again seek leave to file the action without payment of fees or costs by fully completing the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO 239). Otherwise, plaintiff is advised this action will be dismissed without prejudice unless plaintiff pays the full $400.00 filing fee within twenty days of this order. ; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKF2, Chambers)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Robert Gene Downing (jln, Dpty Clk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tulsa Police Dept. by Robert Gene Downing (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downing v. Tulsa Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gene Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?