Spencer v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Heather Spencer
Defendant: Bob Adcox, Carl Funderburk, Jaime Vogt, Tammy Bruce, Brian Swenson, Carol Swenson, Gerald Lovoi, Wallace Kendall Johnson, Brenda Kimery, James W Keeley, Anthony Miller, Jerry Perigo and Kendall Wallace Johnson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00278
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 8/1/2019, Replies due by 8/15/2019) (Re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and motion to dismiss claim as outside the statute of limitations;, #17 MOTION to Dismiss , #19 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support, #16 MOTION to Dismiss , #22 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by Bob Adcox (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by Jerry Perigo (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Defendants' have filed Motions to Dismiss which should first be resolved. (Re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and motion to dismiss claim as outside the statute of limitations;, #16 MOTION to Dismiss , #19 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support, #17 MOTION to Dismiss ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian Russell Swenson on behalf of Brian Swenson, Carol Swenson (Swenson, Brian)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Brian Swenson, Carol Swenson [Note: Attorney Brian Russell Swenson added to party Brian Swenson(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Russell Swenson added to party Carol Swenson(pty:dft).] (Swenson, Brian)
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and motion to dismiss claim as outside the statute of limitations; by Gerald Lovoi [Note: Attorney Gerald Joseph Lovoi added to party Gerald Lovoi(pty:dft).] (With attachments) (Lovoi, Gerald)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Kendall Wallace Johnson (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support by Tammy Bruce, Carl Funderburk, James W Keeley, Anthony Miller (Lawson, Stefanie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stefanie Erin Lawson on behalf of Tammy Bruce, Carl Funderburk, James W Keeley, Anthony Miller [Note: Attorney Stefanie Erin Lawson added to party Tammy Bruce(pty:dft), Attorney Stefanie Erin Lawson added to party Carl Funderburk(pty:dft), Attorney Stefanie Erin Lawson added to party James W Keeley(pty:dft), Attorney Stefanie Erin Lawson added to party Anthony Miller(pty:dft).] (Lawson, Stefanie)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Jaime Vogt (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Kendall Wallace Johnson(dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 6/24/2019 to correct the filer (dlg, Dpty Clk).
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jerry Perigo (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Heather Spencer (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Gerald Lovoi (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Heather Spencer (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Bob Adcox (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Heather Spencer (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Brian Swenson (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Heather Spencer (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Carol Swenson (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Heather Spencer (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Carl Funderburk (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Heather Spencer (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jaime Vogt (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Heather Spencer (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kendall Wallace Johnson (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Heather Spencer (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Anthony Miller (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Heather Spencer (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: James W Keeley (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Heather Spencer (dlg, Dpty Clk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Tammy Bruce (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Heather Spencer (dlg, Dpty Clk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Heather Spencer (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Heather Spencer (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Adcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Funderburk
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Bruce
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Swenson
Represented By: Brian Russell Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Swenson
Represented By: Brian Russell Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Lovoi
Represented By: Gerald Joseph Lovoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Kendall Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Kimery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Keeley
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Miller
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Perigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Wallace Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?