McCleland v. Shadow Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Floyd McCleland
Defendant: Scott Stewart and Shadow Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00279
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 10/24/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2019, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/21/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Agreed JOINT STATUS REPORT by Floyd McCleland (Edwards, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/24/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Scott Stewart (Coffey, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Shadow Trucking, LLC (Coffey, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shadow Trucking, LLC (Coffey, Robert)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong State Court filing date entered; Correction: file date changed to reflect date Petition was filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Shadow Trucking, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicholaus Adam Hancock on behalf of Shadow Trucking, LLC, Scott Stewart (Hancock, Nicholaus)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert P Coffey, Jr on behalf of Shadow Trucking, LLC, Scott Stewart (Coffey, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Shadow Trucking, LLC, Scott Stewart (Coffey, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Rogers County District Court, case number CJ-2019-167 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2056458) by Shadow Trucking, LLC, Scott Stewart (With attachments) (Coffey, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Shadow Trucking, LLC, Scott Stewart (Coffey, Robert)
April 24, 2019 Amended PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Floyd McCleland (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 5/22/2019 to correct file date of amended petition (sc, Dpty Clk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCleland v. Shadow Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Stewart
Represented By: Nicholaus Adam Hancock
Represented By: Robert P Coffey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shadow Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Nicholaus Adam Hancock
Represented By: Robert P Coffey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd McCleland
Represented By: Jeffrey L Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?