Hansen et al v. 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Debra Hansen and Courtney Jackson
Defendant: Waterfront Grill, LLC and 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00280
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Claire V Eagan
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Waterfront Grill, LLC (Broussard, Steven)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC (Broussard, Steven)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC, Waterfront Grill, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/31/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to attorney conflict, recusing Chief Judge John E Dowdell. Judge Claire V Eagan reassigned to case., changing case number to 19-CV-280-CVE-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John M O'Connor on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney John M O'Connor added to party 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John M O'Connor added to party Waterfront Grill, LLC(pty:dft).] (O'Connor, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John W Dowdell on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney John W Dowdell added to party 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John W Dowdell added to party Waterfront Grill, LLC(pty:dft).] (Dowdell, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC, Waterfront Grill, LLC (Broussard, Steven)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven Anthony Broussard on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Steven Anthony Broussard added to party 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Anthony Broussard added to party Waterfront Grill, LLC(pty:dft).] (Broussard, Steven)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Waterfront Grill, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Debra Hansen, Courtney Jackson (Ingle, J)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Debra Hansen, Courtney Jackson (Ingle, J)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC, Waterfront Grill, LLC (jln, Dpty Clk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC, Waterfront Grill, LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2056891) by Debra Hansen, Courtney Jackson (Ingle, J)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Debra Hansen, Courtney Jackson (Ingle, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen et al v. 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Hansen
Represented By: J Derek Ingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Jackson
Represented By: J Derek Ingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterfront Grill, LLC
Represented By: John M O'Connor
Represented By: Steven Anthony Broussard
Represented By: John W Dowdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6 B's Restaurant Management Group, LLC
Represented By: John M O'Connor
Represented By: Steven Anthony Broussard
Represented By: John W Dowdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?