United States of America v. Toon et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners, Unknown Heirs Kenya H Toon, Occupants of the Premises, Jason B Toon and County Treasurer
Case Number: 4:2019cv00313
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Referring Judge: James H Payne
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/20/2019) (pll, Dpty Clk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER (Re: #13 Amended Complaint ) by Occupants of the Premises, Jason B Toon (Toon, Jason)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by United States of America (With attachments) (Radford, Loretta)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Occupants of the Premises (Re: #2 Complaint ) by United States of America (Radford, Loretta)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: County Treasurer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by United States of America (Radford, Loretta)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Board of County Commissioners (Re: #2 Complaint ) by United States of America (Radford, Loretta)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jason B Toon (Re: #2 Complaint ) by United States of America (Radford, Loretta)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge James H Payne ; granting #4 Motion for Service by Publication (pll, Dpty Clk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Occupants of the Premises, Jason B Toon [Note: Attorney Jason B Toon added to party Occupants of the Premises(pty:dft), Attorney Jason B Toon added to party Jason B Toon(pty:dft).] (Toon, Jason)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Board of County Commissioners, County Treasurer (With attachments) (Sawyer, Scott)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott Thomas Sawyer on behalf of Board of County Commissioners, County Treasurer [Note: Attorney Scott Thomas Sawyer added to party Board of County Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Thomas Sawyer added to party County Treasurer(pty:dft).] (Sawyer, Scott)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service by Publication by United States of America (Radford, Loretta)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Board of County Commissioners, County Treasurer, Occupants of the Premises, Jason B Toon (jln, Dpty Clk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America (With attachments) (Radford, Loretta)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (Radford, Loretta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Toon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Scott Thomas Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs Kenya H Toon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occupants of the Premises
Represented By: Jason B Toon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason B Toon
Represented By: Jason B Toon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Treasurer
Represented By: Scott Thomas Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Loretta Finiece Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?