Sunbelt Supply LP v. Fabwell Corporation
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Supply LP
Defendant: Fabwell Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00315
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/28/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Fabwell Corporation (Keester, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Fabwell Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendant to file its Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by 7/28/2019. ; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lmc, Chambers)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Terence Keester on behalf of Fabwell Corporation (Keester, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fabwell Corporation (Keester, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Fabwell Corporation [Note: Attorney Michael Terence Keester added to party Fabwell Corporation(pty:dft).] (Keester, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent FloWorks LLC, Other Affiliate S-I GP LLC for Sunbelt Supply LP) by Sunbelt Supply LP (Weger, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James E Weger on behalf of Sunbelt Supply LP (Weger, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Fabwell Corporation (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Sunbelt Supply LP to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Fabwell Corporation (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2066858) by Sunbelt Supply LP (With attachments) (Weger, James) Modified on 6/14/2019 to add receipt number(sc, Dpty Clk).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sunbelt Supply LP (Weger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunbelt Supply LP v. Fabwell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabwell Corporation
Represented By: Michael Terence Keester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Supply LP
Represented By: James E Weger
Represented By: Patrick George Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?