Queens, LLC, The et al v. Seneca-Cayuga Nation, The
Plaintiff: Queens, LLC, The and Cherokee Queen, LLC
Defendant: Seneca-Cayuga Nation, The
Case Number: 4:2019cv00350
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seneca-Cayuga Nation, The (Luthey, Graydon)
August 10, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing The Seneca-Cayuga Nation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Due to Tribal Sovereign Immunity by Seneca-Cayuga Nation, The (With attachments) (Luthey, Graydon)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr on behalf of Seneca-Cayuga Nation, The [Note: Attorney Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr added to party Seneca-Cayuga Nation, The(pty:dft).] (Luthey, Graydon)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Seneca-Cayuga Nation, The (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Queens, LLC, The, Cherokee Queen, LLC (Gomez, Daniel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cherokee Queen, LLC (Gomez, Daniel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Queens, LLC, The (Gomez, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Queens, LLC, The and Cherokee Queen, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Seneca-Cayuga Nation, The (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel Eduardo Gomez on behalf of Cherokee Queen, LLC, Queens, LLC, The (Gomez, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Seneca-Cayuga Nation, The (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2073978 by Queens, LLC, The, Cherokee Queen, LLC (With attachments) (Gomez, Daniel) Modified on 7/1/2019 to add filing fee receipt information. (dlg, Dpty Clk).
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cherokee Queen, LLC, Queens, LLC, The (Gomez, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Queens, LLC, The et al v. Seneca-Cayuga Nation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queens, LLC, The
Represented By: Daniel Eduardo Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherokee Queen, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Eduardo Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seneca-Cayuga Nation, The
Represented By: Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?