Scholle Rougeot v. Gran Miracle Chiropractic et al
Plaintiff: Mitsuko Deana Scholle Rougeot
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield, Cassandra Nichole Robinson, Internal Revenue Service, Gran Miracle Chiropractic, RMO and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00353
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell granting Michael R. Green's Amended Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant RMO (Doc. 22). ; terminating attorney Michael Ross Green ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/30/2019); granting #22 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (SAS, Chambers)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell granting the Motion to Amend the Docket and the United States' Crossclaim (Doc. 20). ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/3/2019); granting #20 Motion to Amend (SAS, Chambers)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Andrew Brown on behalf of Cassandra Nichole Robinson [Note: Attorney Jason Andrew Brown added to party Cassandra Nichole Robinson(pty:dft).] (Brown, Jason)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 Amended MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by RMO (With attachments) (Green, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report (Doc. 19) is granted. The Joint Status Report is due September 18, 2019. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 9/18/2019); granting #19 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend the Docket and the United States' Crossclaim by Internal Revenue Service (With attachments) (Smith, Casey)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to File Joint Status Report (Re: #12 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) by Internal Revenue Service (Smith, Casey)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion to Withdraw (Doc. 17) is denied at this time, as it does not contain sufficient information or justification. The motion may be re-urged with proper grounds, or upon notification that substitute counsel has or will enter an appearance on behalf of Mr. Green's client, or upon other good cause shown ; denying #17 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JED1, Chambers)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by RMO (Green, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER (Re: #7 Counterclaim ) by Mitsuko Deana Scholle Rougeot (Truskett, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Blue Cross Blue Shield to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLAIMER by Blue Cross Blue Shield (Ramsey, Rodney)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rodney Clark Ramsey on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield [Note: Attorney Rodney Clark Ramsey added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield(pty:dft), Attorney Rodney Clark Ramsey added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield(pty:crd).] (Ramsey, Rodney)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/19/2019) (SAS, Chambers)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Gran Miracle Chiropractic be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #10 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Gran Miracle Chiropractic (Green, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Court has been made aware of a party name error in this case by Rehabilitation Medicine of Oklahoma. The party is directed to file a Notice of Party Name Correction, of which the form can be found on our website under the civil forms. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 CROSS-CLAIM against Blue Cross Blue Shield, Gran Miracle Chiropractic by Internal Revenue Service (Smith, Casey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 COUNTERCLAIM against Mitsuko Deana Scholle Rougeot by Internal Revenue Service (Smith, Casey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Internal Revenue Service (Smith, Casey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Gran Miracle Chiropractic to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Status Report on Removed Action, #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) by Internal Revenue Service (Smith, Casey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Internal Revenue Service (Smith, Casey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, case number CJ-2017-3688 by Internal Revenue Service (With attachments) (Smith, Casey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Internal Revenue Service (Smith, Casey)
March 28, 2019 Amended PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Mitsuko Deana Scholle Rougeot (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scholle Rougeot v. Gran Miracle Chiropractic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield
Represented By: Rodney Clark Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Nichole Robinson
Represented By: John Scott Gladd
Represented By: Jason Andrew Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Casey Shawn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gran Miracle Chiropractic
Represented By: Michael Ross Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMO
Represented By: Michael Ross Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsuko Deana Scholle Rougeot
Represented By: John Paul Truskett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?