Garner v. Economy Supply, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kylie Garner
Defendant: Economy Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00372
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Defendant's answer to the remaining claims of plaintiff's complaint due no later than 9/13/19, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/13/2019) (Re: #15 Opinion and Order,, Ruling on Motion to Dismiss, State Court Petition/Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting #9 Motion to Dismiss (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 1/15/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 2/19/2020, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/23/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Kylie Garner (Smolen, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Claim for Relief for Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress ) by Economy Supply, Inc. ; (Latham, Bobby)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Claim for Relief for Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress ) by Kylie Garner ; (Smolen, Daniel)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/16/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Claim for Relief for Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress by Economy Supply, Inc. (Latham, Bobby)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Economy Supply, Inc. for Economy Supply, Inc.) by Economy Supply, Inc. (McPherson, Troy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Economy Supply, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Troy James McPherson on behalf of Economy Supply, Inc. (McPherson, Troy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 JURY DEMAND by Economy Supply, Inc. (Latham, Bobby)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bobby Leon Latham, Jr on behalf of Economy Supply, Inc. (Latham, Bobby)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Economy Supply, Inc. (Latham, Bobby)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Creek County District Court (Sapulpa Division), case number CJ-2019-190 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2076837) by Economy Supply, Inc. (With attachments) (Latham, Bobby)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Economy Supply, Inc. (Latham, Bobby)
June 20, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Economy Supply, Inc. by Kylie Garner (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. Economy Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylie Garner
Represented By: Lauren Grace Lambright
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Troy James McPherson
Represented By: Bobby Leon Latham, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?