Lavender v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kalen E Lavender
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00375
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachael Faye Zintgraff on behalf of Social Security Administration [Note: Attorney Rachael Faye Zintgraff added to party Social Security Administration(pty:dft).] (Zintgraff, Rachael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Kalen E Lavender (Buchner, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning this case upon the filing of Dkt #6 and pursuant to General Order 16-08. Reassigning case to Chief Judge John E. Dowdell and Magistrate Judge Frank H. McCarthy, changing case number to 19-cv-375-JED-FHM (Re: #6 Statement Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Social Security) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Kalen E Lavender (Buchner, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge [includes the following attachments: (1) a Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, and (2) a copy of General Order 16-08] (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 11, 2019 ***Remark: 2 Summons in Hold Tray (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Kalen E Lavender (Buchner, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Kalen E Lavender (Buchner, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kalen E Lavender (Buchner, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavender v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalen E Lavender
Represented By: Mark Eugene Buchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?