Fetz v. U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Patrick Valentine Fetz
Respondent: U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv00376
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 ***Remark: mailed a copy of Petitioner's 2241 petition (Doc. 1) and a copy of this order #4 to William Barr, Attorney General of the United States at: WILLIAM BARR, Attorney General of the United States US Department of Justice 950 PENNSYLVANIA AVE NW WASHINGTON DC 20530-0001; Kevin McAleenan, Acting Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security at: KEVEN MCALEENAN, Acting Secretary Office of the Executive Secretary MS 0525 U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security 2707 MARTIN LUTHER KING JR AVE SE WASHINGTON DC 20528-0525; and R. Trent Shores, U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Oklahoma at: ROBERT TRENT SHORES, US Attorney Northern District of Oklahoma 110 W 7TH ST TULSA OK 74119. (Re: #4 Order,,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,,,,,, ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Respondent shall respond to the petition for writ of habeas corpus no later than sixty (60) days from the entry of this order. Petitioner may file a reply within twenty-one (21) days after the filing of Respondent's response. If Respondent files a motion to dismiss, Petitioner has twenty-one (21) days from the filing date of the motion to respond. Failure to respond to a motion to dismiss may result in dismissal of this action.The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of Petitioner's 2241 petition (Doc. 1) and a copy of this order to William Barr, Attorney General of the United States; Kevin McAleenan, Acting Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security; and R. Trent Shores, U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Oklahoma. , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 10/7/2019, Replies due by 10/28/2019) (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 ) (SAS, Chambers)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Patrick Valentine Fetz (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 15, 2019 ***Remark: mailed Petitioner a blank motion to proceed in forma pauperis (form AO-240) identified as Case No. 19-CV-0376-JED-JFJ to: Patrick Valentine Fetz David L Moss 300 N DENVER AVE TULSA, OK 74103; mailed copy of #2 to Accounting Officials at the David L. Moss Criminal Justice Center (Re: #2 Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Petitioner must either (1) submit the $5 filing fee or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, using the court-approved form and providing a completed statement of institutional accounts signed by an authorized official. The Clerk of Court shall send Petitioner a blank motion to proceed in forma pauperis (form AO-240) identified as Case No. 19-CV-0376-JED-JFJ. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to both Petitioner and to the accounting officials at the David L. Moss Criminal Justice Center, Tulsa, Oklahoma., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 8/2/2019) (SAS, Chambers)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 by Patrick Valentine Fetz (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fetz v. U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Valentine Fetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?