Pope et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Russ Caraway and Sharon Pope
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00377
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 Amended JOINT STATUS REPORT by Russ Caraway, Sharon Pope (Duren, Dylan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Russ Caraway, Sharon Pope (Duren, Dylan)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/30/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (With attachments) (Brewer, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Brewer, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 JURY DEMAND by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Brewer, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent WSE Investment, LLC, Corporate Parent WSE Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Brewer, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Dillon Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Scott, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Wayne Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Brewer, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Brewer, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2019-02556 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2077203) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (With attachments) (Brewer, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Brewer, Michael)
June 24, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by Russ Caraway, Sharon Pope (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pope et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Jeffrey Dillon Scott
Represented By: Michael Wayne Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Caraway
Represented By: Dylan Tyler Duren
Represented By: Charles R Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Pope
Represented By: Dylan Tyler Duren
Represented By: Charles R Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?