Nelson v. Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Plaintiff: Howard Nelson
Defendant: AT&T, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company and SBC Communications
Case Number: 4:2019cv00379
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ John D. Russell ( Settlement Conference set for 6/3/2020 at 01:30 PM before Adjunct Judge) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 5/15/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 5/29/2020, Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 9/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Rector, Jonathan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER (Re: #10 Amended Complaint ) by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Rector, Jonathan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for Southwestern Bell Telephone Company) by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Rector, Jonathan) Modified on 7/18/2019 to remove AT&T Inc as a filer (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/15/2019) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Howard Nelson (Smolen, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by AT&T, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Rector, Jonathan)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting defense counsel relief from local counsel requirement ; granting #7 Motion for Relief (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Relief (for Relief of Local Counsel Requirement) (Re: #6 Letter re: Local Counsel Requirement ) by AT&T, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Rector, Jonathan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Jonathan Gary Rector (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing AT&T, Inc. and Southwestern Bell Telephone Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan Gary Rector on behalf of AT&T, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Rector, Jonathan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by AT&T, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Rector, Jonathan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from District Court of Tulsa County, State of Oklahoma, case number CJ-2019-02429 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2077202) by AT&T, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (With attachments) (Rector, Jonathan) Modified on 7/10/2019 to add receipt number (sc, Dpty Clk).
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by AT&T, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Rector, Jonathan)
June 14, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Howard Nelson (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Gary Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Jonathan Gary Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBC Communications
Represented By: Jonathan Gary Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Nelson
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?