Avilla v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Leandra Avilla
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00383
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Andrew Gallant on behalf of Social Security Administration [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Andrew Gallant added to party Social Security Administration(pty:dft).] (Gallant, Jeffrey)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Leandra Avilla (Mitzner, Miles)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration (dlg, Dpty Clk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning this case upon the filing of Dkt #7 and pursuant to General Order 16-08. Reassigning case to Chief Judge John E. Dowdell and Magistrate Judge Jodi F. Jayne, changing case number to 19-cv-383-JED-JFJ (Re: #7 Statement Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Social Security) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Leandra Avilla (Mitzner, Miles)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge [includes the following attachments: (1) a Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, and (2) a copy of General Order 16-08] (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Leandra Avilla (Mitzner, Miles)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Miles L Mitzner on behalf of Leandra Avilla (Mitzner, Miles)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Leandra Avilla (Mitzner, Miles)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Leandra Avilla (Mitzner, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avilla v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jeffrey Andrew Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leandra Avilla
Represented By: Miles L Mitzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?