Hall v. Planet Fitness et al
Plaintiff: Albert Matthew Bey Hall, III and Albert Matthew Hall, III
Defendant: Planet Fitness and Excel Fitness
Case Number: 4:2019cv00390
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint ) by Albert Matthew Hall, III (jln, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/15/2019) (jln, Dpty Clk). Modified on 8/15/2019 to replace with correct pdf (jln, Dpty Clk).
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Albert Matthew Hall, III (jln, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/15/2019) (jln, Dpty Clk). Modified on 8/15/2019 to replace pdf with correct document (jln, Dpty Clk).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Filing Fee due by 8/19/2019); denying #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; moot in part and ; denying in part #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to receive punitive damages and unemployment due to religious discrimination by Albert Matthew Hall, III (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Albert Matthew Hall, III (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Excel Fitness, Planet Fitness (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Albert Matthew Hall, III (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting Filing Fee deadline(s): ( Filing Fee due by 8/7/2019); denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Albert Matthew Bey Hall, III (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Albert Matthew Bey Hall, III (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Planet Fitness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Matthew Bey Hall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Matthew Hall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?