Payne v. Sultzer et al
Plaintiff: Edd Tawon Payne
Defendant: S Sultzer, Tulsa Police Department, Rashonda Basham and City of Tulsa, The
Case Number: 4:2019cv00414
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 ***Remark: Copy of Order #6 mailed to FCI Fairton, Federal Correctional Institution, PO Box 280, Fairton, NJ 08320 (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Edd Tawon Payne (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Plaintiff re: filing fee by Edd Tawon Payne (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Edd Tawon Payne (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 14, 2019 ***Remark: mailed Payne a blank civil rights complaint (form PR-01) marked amended and identified as Case No. 19-CV-0414-GKF-FHM to: Edd Tawon Payne #23195-009 FCI Fairton PO BOX 420 FAIRTON, NJ 08320 (sac, Dpty Clk)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting Filing Fee deadline(s): (Amended Complaint due by 9/12/2019); ( Initial Filing Fee due by 9/12/2019); terminating party Tulsa Police Department ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Re: #1 Complaint ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 29, 2019 ***Remark: 3 summons in hold tray & 3 USM 285s in hold tray (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Edd Tawon Payne (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 7/29/2019 - image is as legible as the original (sc, Dpty Clk).
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Edd Tawon Payne (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 7/29/2019 - image is as legible as the original (sc, Dpty Clk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Sultzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashonda Basham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tulsa, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edd Tawon Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?