New v. Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County et al
Plaintiff: Daree New
Defendant: Justin Jones, Tulsa County, Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County and Tulsa Juvenile Bureau
Case Number: 4:2019cv00425
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Directing counsel for plaintiff to correct case caption on future pleadings. Per 9 and footnote 1 of the motion #8 , defendant "Tulsa County" was terminated as a party defendant in this matter. Plaintiff's unopposed motion #12 is granted as requested. Response and reply deadlines regarding #10 motion to dismiss are extended as follows. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 10/4/2019, Replies due by 10/18/2019); granting #12 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 9 Minute Order,,,, Adding/Terminating Party(ies),,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,,,,,,, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,,, #12 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Daree New (Smolen, Daniel)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in entering the scheduling order. If necessary, a scheduling order will be entered after ruling on the pending motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 10). (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County, Justin Jones, Tulsa Juvenile Bureau (Williams, Nicholas)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - that the motion #8 is granted. Defendants may file their answer(s) or other responsive pleading(s) no later than due 8/30/19 as requested. Per footnote 1 of the motion #8 , defendant "Tulsa County" is terminated as a party defendant in this matter. Parties are directed to correct case caption on future pleadings. ; terminating party Tulsa County ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 8/30/2019); granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County, Justin Jones, Tulsa Juvenile Bureau (Rea, James)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County, Justin Jones, Tulsa Juvenile Bureau (Williams, Nicholas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicholas Charles Williams on behalf of Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County, Justin Jones, Tulsa Juvenile Bureau [Note: Attorney Nicholas Charles Williams added to party Justin Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Charles Williams added to party Tulsa Juvenile Bureau(pty:dft).] (Williams, Nicholas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Griffin Rea on behalf of Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County, Justin Jones, Tulsa Juvenile Bureau [Note: Attorney James Griffin Rea added to party Justin Jones(pty:dft), Attorney James Griffin Rea added to party Tulsa Juvenile Bureau(pty:dft).] (Rea, James)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa Cty Dist Ct, case number CJ-2019-2706 by Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 8, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Daree New (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New v. Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Jones
Represented By: Nicholas Charles Williams
Represented By: James Griffin Rea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for Tulsa County
Represented By: Nicholas Charles Williams
Represented By: James Griffin Rea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa Juvenile Bureau
Represented By: Nicholas Charles Williams
Represented By: James Griffin Rea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daree New
Represented By: Lauren Grace Lambright
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?