Petco Petroleum Corporation v. West et al
Plaintiff: Petco Petroleum Corporation
Defendant: Flash Electric Services LLC, David West, U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC, R Steve Crowder, Phillip L Osterhout and Kenneth Hinshaw
Case Number: 4:2019cv00439
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
2 Judge: Susan E Huntsman
3 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #167 Motion to Strike Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #167 Joint MOTION to Strike Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Dispositive Motions Hearing ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Joint MOTION to Strike Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Dispositive Motions Hearing by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION of Plaintiff to Deem Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants David West and Flash Electric Services LLC Confessed by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Gerow, Blake)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION of Dismissal, dismissing U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC, R. Steve Crowder, Phillip L. Osterhout, Kenneth Hinshaw, dismissing all claims asserted between only the Settling Parties, by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 1/10/2023); granting #163 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #163 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Extend the Deadline for Filing Stipulation of Dismissal ) (clb, Dpty Clk)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Extend the Deadline for Filing Stipulation of Dismissal by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendants David West and Flash Electric Services LLC by Petco Petroleum Corporation (With attachments) (Gerow, Blake)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell the settlement report having been amended to reflect a partial settlement (See Doc. 160 ), VACATING the Administrative Closing Order [Doc. 159], vacating/setting aside order(s), reopening case, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): The Scheduling Order entered 9/19/2022 is reinstated: ( Discovery due by 12/5/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 12/19/2022, Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (Re: #159 Order, Administratively Closing Case, 160 Minute Order,,, #149 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s), ) (Documents Terminated: #159 Order, Administratively Closing Case ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little The ASJ has supplied the court with an amended settlement report, indicating that the case did not settle as to defendants David West and Flash Electric Services LLC, such that the litigation has only partially settled. (Re: 158 Minute Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDLJ, Judge)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #159 ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal due by 12/21/2022), administratively closing the case (terminates case) (kjp, Dpty Clk) Modified on 11/29/2022 - VACATED per 161 (sc, Dpty Clk).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little ASJ Paul DeMuro advised the Court that the litigation has settled. The parties shall file their fully executed Stipulation of Dismissal by 12/21/22., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 12/21/2022) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDL2, Chambers)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT by Adjunct Settlement Judge Paul DeMuro advising settlement negotiations are pending. The parties are to phone ASJ DeMuro by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, November 18, 2022. (CDL2, Chambers)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little Upon consideration of the Motion to Participate in Settlement Conference by Phone (Doc. No. 154), the Motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant David West, Defendant Flash Electric Services, LLC, and their counsel are permitted to participate in the November 16, 2022, settlement conference via telephonic means. Counsel for Defendants West and Flash Electric is directed to coordinate with the Adjunct Settlement Judge in advance of the settlement conference. ; granting #154 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Re: #154 MOTION Motion to Participate in Settlement Conference by Phone ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDL2, Chambers)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Little (Re: #154 MOTION Motion to Participate in Settlement Conference by Phone ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION Motion to Participate in Settlement Conference by Phone by David West (Ross, David)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ Paul DeMuro (at courthouse) ( Settlement Conference set for 11/16/2022 at 10:00 AM before Adjunct Settlement Judge); granting #151 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference (Re: #151 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference ) (CDL2, Chambers)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Little (Re: #151 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Alan Warman by on behalf of Kenneth Hinshaw (Warman, Mark)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Sixth Amended Scheduling Order) ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 12/5/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 12/19/2022, Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #148 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) [Modify Remaining Deadlines in the Fourth Amended Scheduling Order] by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #146 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (lah, Chambers)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Unopposed MOTION of Plaintiff for Order Permitting Use of Electronic Stenographic Equipment at Deposition of David West by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Gerow, Blake)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ Paul DeMuro (at courthouse) ( Settlement Conference set for 10/14/2022 at 10:00 AM before Adjunct Settlement Judge); granting #143 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference (LML, Chambers)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Little (Re: #143 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Fifth Amended Scheduling Order) ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 10/3/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 10/17/2022, Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #141 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #139 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (lah, Chambers)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Depose Defendant David West by Petco Petroleum Corporation (With attachments) (Gerow, Blake)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney Grant Bailey Thetford ; granting #136 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (lah, Chambers)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ Paul DeMuro (at courthouse) ( Settlement Conference set for 8/11/2022 at 10:00 AM before Adjunct Settlement Judge) (LML, Chambers)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) as Counsel for Defendants by R Steve Crowder, Phillip L Osterhout, U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC (Thetford, Grant)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by Phillip L Osterhout (McLemore, Evan)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by R Steve Crowder (McLemore, Evan)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Fourth Amended Scheduling Order), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 8/1/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2022, Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 11/21/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Judge Gregory K Frizzell: Status Hearing held on 2/1/2022 (setting Answer deadline for defendants Crowder and Osterhout: 2/9/22), striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell - Time Change Only, the Scheduling/Status hearing on 2/1/2022 will be held at 10:30 AM, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Hearing set for 2/1/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell striking scheduling/status hearing set on 1/11/2022 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): Scheduling/ ( Status Hearing set for 2/1/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #129 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Scheduling and Status Conference by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Gerow, Blake)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by Flash Electric Services LLC, David West (Ross, David)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell setting a scheduling/status conference for January 11, 2022 at 2:00 p.m., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): In-person hearing, ( Status Hearing set for 1/11/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by Flash Electric Services LLC, David West (Ross, David)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #110 Motion to Dismiss (lah, Chambers)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #123 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lah, Chambers)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by Flash Electric Services LLC, David West (Ross, David)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline set 11/15/2021) ; granting #121 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by Flash Electric Services LLC, David West (Ross, David)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Robert Ross on behalf of Flash Electric Services LLC, David West [Note: Attorney David Robert Ross added to party Flash Electric Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Robert Ross added to party David West(pty:dft).] (Ross, David)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; lifting the stay; granting #118 Motion to Lift Stay (Re: 61 Minute Order,,, Ruling on Motion to Stay,, ) (lah, Chambers)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings Against Defendants David West and Flash Electric Services, LLC by Petco Petroleum Corporation (With attachments) (Tifft, Aaron)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #116 Motion to Strike Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (lah, Chambers)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION to Strike Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Defendant Kenneth Hinshaw's Motion to Supplement Response Objecting to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim is denied as defendant makes no allegation that new material was raised for the first time in the reply brief. See LCvR7-1(f). ; denying #113 Motion to Supplement (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #113 MOTION to Supplement Response Objecting to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation ; (Tifft, Aaron)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION to Supplement Response Objecting to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim (Re: #112 Reply to Response to Motion ) by Kenneth Hinshaw (Warman, Mark)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #110 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Kenneth Hinshaw ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation ; (Tifft, Aaron)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #110 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Kenneth Hinshaw ) by Kenneth Hinshaw ; (Warman, Mark)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION to Dismiss (Re: #106 Counterclaim) Counterclaim of Defendant Kenneth Hinshaw by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron) Modified on 8/6/2021 to create link to doc. 106 (sc, Dpty Clk).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell The Court has a significant number of criminal cases awaiting trial due to the COVID-19 pandemic and the decision of the Supreme Court in McGirt v. United States, 140 S. Ct. 2452 (2020). Criminal cases must be tried before civil cases, and civil cases will most likely not be tried by a district judge unless and until all criminal cases on a monthly trial docket have been resolved or continued. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, the parties in a civil case may consent to a trial before a magistrate judge, and this option is available for civil litigants who wish to have a jury trial. The AO-85 consent forms are available on the U.S. District Court website. However, the parties are free to withhold consent to a trial before a magistrate judge without any adverse consequences, and the parties are reminded of this option only as a possible means of expediting a civil trial in cases in which the parties desire to expedite the final resolution of their case. The parties may also request an additional settlement conference at any time. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC (McLemore, Evan)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Blake H Gerow on behalf of Petco Petroleum Corporation [Note: Attorney Blake H Gerow added to party Petco Petroleum Corporation(pty:pla).] (Gerow, Blake)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Petco Petroleum Corporation by Kenneth Hinshaw (Warman, Mark)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ANSWER (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by Kenneth Hinshaw (Warman, Mark)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; denying #85 Motion to Dismiss; denying #87 Motion to Dismiss (lah, Chambers)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 21-15, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, Magistrate Judge Christine D Little no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 19-cv-439-GKF-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney Barrett Lynn Powers ; granting #101 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Flash Electric Services LLC, David West (Powers, Barrett)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #87 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and Brief in Support ) by Kenneth Hinshaw ; (Warman, Mark)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #85 MOTION to Dismiss ) by R Steve Crowder, Phillip L Osterhout ; (With attachments) (Thetford, John)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #87 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and Brief in Support ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation ; (Tifft, Aaron)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #85 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation ; (Tifft, Aaron)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: pdf had wrong reply date; Correction: attached pdf with corrected reply date (Re: #95 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion, ) (srt, Dpty Clk)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 3/11/2021, Replies due by 3/25/2021); granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #87 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and Brief in Support ) (lah, Chambers) Modified on 3/3/2021 to replace pdf with corrected reply deadline) (srt, Dpty Clk).
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Partial Dismissal by Defendant Hinshaw (Re: #87 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and Brief in Support ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 3/8/2021, Replies due by 3/22/2021); granting #92 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #85 MOTION to Dismiss ) (lah, Chambers)
February 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #85 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 3/4/2021, Replies due by 3/18/2021); granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #87 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and Brief in Support ) (lah, Chambers)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 3/1/2021, Replies due by 3/15/2021); granting #88 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #85 MOTION to Dismiss ) (lah, Chambers)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Partial Dismissal by Defendant Hinshaw (Re: #87 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and Brief in Support ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #85 MOTION to Dismiss) Response to Defendants Crowder's and Osterhout's Motion for Partial Dismissal and Brief in Support by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron) Modified on 2/4/2021 to change event and create link to 85 (sac, Dpty Clk).
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearings/Deadlines); Correction: changed event (Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion) (Re: #88 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and Brief in Support by Kenneth Hinshaw (Warman, Mark)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Alan Warman on behalf of Kenneth Hinshaw [Note: Attorney Mark Alan Warman added to party Kenneth Hinshaw(pty:dft).] (Warman, Mark)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss by R Steve Crowder, Phillip L Osterhout (Thetford, John)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC (McLemore, Evan)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Grant Bailey Thetford on behalf of R Steve Crowder, Phillip L Osterhout [Note: Attorney Grant Bailey Thetford added to party R Steve Crowder(pty:dft), Attorney Grant Bailey Thetford added to party Phillip L Osterhout(pty:dft).] (Thetford, Grant)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Michael Thetford on behalf of R Steve Crowder, Phillip L Osterhout [Note: Attorney John Michael Thetford added to party R Steve Crowder(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Thetford added to party Phillip L Osterhout(pty:dft).] (Thetford, John)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Evan Mcguire McLemore on behalf of R Steve Crowder, Phillip L Osterhout [Note: Attorney Evan Mcguire McLemore added to party R Steve Crowder(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Mcguire McLemore added to party Phillip L Osterhout(pty:dft).] (McLemore, Evan)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Phillip L Osterhout (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kenneth Hinshaw (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: R Steve Crowder (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lah, Chambers)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #72 Amended Complaint, ) by U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC (McLemore, Evan)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Third Amended Scheduling Order), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 10/1/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2021, Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 2/22/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk) Modified on 9/21/2021 - STRICKEN per #117 (sc, Dpty Clk).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Judge Gregory K Frizzell: Scheduling Conference held on 1/4/2021 , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (Court Reporter: None) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to R Steve Crowder, Kenneth Hinshaw, Phillip L Osterhout (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants David West, U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC, Flash Electric Services LLC, R. Steve Crowder, Phillip L. Osterhout, and Kenneth Hinshaw (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell As set forth in the Court's Opinion and Order at Doc. 70, a telephonic scheduling conference is set for January 4, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to set up the conference call and notify the court and all parties of the conference call-in number and access information. If any party requests a court reporter be present for the conference, please notify Courtroom Deputy Karen Perkins by December 29, 2020., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Hearing set for 1/4/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #55 Motion to Amend (lah, Chambers)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little The Joint Motion to Continue Settlement Conference (Doc. 66) is granted. The Settlement Conference set on 12/9/2020 at 9:30 a.m. is stricken to be reset upon application. ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #66 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (LML, Chambers)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney Ashley Rose Ogle ; granting #67 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (lah, Chambers)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Flash Electric Services LLC, David West (Ogle, Ashley)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #55 MOTION to Amend Complaint ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation ; (Tifft, Aaron)
November 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 20-37, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 19-cv-439-GKF-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (a-hc, Dpty Clk)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Re: #55 MOTION to Amend Complaint ) by U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC ; (With attachments) (McLemore, Evan)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting in part #56 Motion to Strike (lah, Chambers)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell The Motion of defendants David West and Flash Electric Services, LLC to Stay Proceedings as between plaintiff and West/Flash Electric Pending Final Resolution of United States of America v. David Owen West, Case No. 20-cr-189-CVE is granted, as plaintiff has no objection, the allegations in the civil and criminal proceedings are similar, West is under criminal indictment, and plaintiff does not continue to suffer losses ; granting #59 Motion to Stay (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKFJ, Judge)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #56 MOTION to Strike Second Amended Scheduling Order or, in the Alternative, to Extend Deadlines, ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation ; (Tifft, Aaron)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Final Resolution of Criminal Case by Flash Electric Services LLC, David West (With attachments) (Powers, Barrett)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 First RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #56 MOTION to Strike Second Amended Scheduling Order or, in the Alternative, to Extend Deadlines, ) by U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC ; (With attachments) (McLemore, Evan)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell directing defendant U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC to file a response to plaintiff's Motion to Strike Scheduling Order or, in the alternative, to Extend Deadlines [Doc. 56] on or before October 27, 2020., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 10/27/2020) (Re: #56 MOTION to Strike Second Amended Scheduling Order or, in the Alternative, to Extend Deadlines, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Strike Second Amended Scheduling Order or, in the Alternative, to Extend Deadlines, by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Petco Petroleum Corporation (With attachments) (Tifft, Aaron)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary resetting Settlement Conference. Plaintiff's Settlement Conference Statement will be due November 25, 2020. Defendant's Settlement Conference Statement will be due December 2, 2020, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ Curtis Craig ( Settlement Conference set for 12/9/2020 at 09:30 AM before Adjunct Settlement Judge) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Second Amended Scheduling Order) ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 12/2/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2020, Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/29/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 4/19/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #52 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Amended Scheduling Order) Granting Joint Application for Amended Scheduling Order [Doc. 19] ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 9/2/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2020, Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/28/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting #50 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary striking Settlement Conference, to be reset at a later date, striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary resetting Settlement Conference. Plaintiff's Settlement Conference Statement will be due March 31, 2020. Defendant's Settlement Conference Statement will be due April 7, 2020, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ Curtis Craig ( Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 09:30 AM before Adjunct Judge) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney Trevor Ray Henson ; granting #46 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery [Doc. 44] is Granted and the deadline is extended to February 27, 2020. ; granting #44 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Respond to Discovery by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ Curtis Craig ( Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2020 at 09:30 AM before Adjunct Judge) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #41 Motion for Protective Order (tjc, Dpty Clk)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 6/2/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2020, Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/28/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Vacating minute order at Doc. 38 and STRIKING Scheduling Conference set on 1/14/2020. Scheduling order will be entered separately, striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s), vacating/setting aside order(s) (Re: 38 Minute Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), ) (Documents Terminated: 38 Minute Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s), ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell setting Scheduling Conference for January 14, 2020. If any party requests a court reporter be present for the conference, please notify courtroom deputy, Karen Perkins, by January 6, 2020, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk) Modified on 12/3/2019 - VACATED per 39 (sac, Dpty Clk).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWER (Re: #1 Complaint ) by U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC (McLemore, Evan)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Michael Thetford on behalf of U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC [Note: Attorney John Michael Thetford added to party U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC(pty:dft).] (Thetford, John)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/2/2019) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell The Motion to Dismiss of defendant U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC is denied, as plaintiff has stated a claim that is plausible on its face. The limitations issue as to whether claims pertaining to some of the 46 deliveries are time-barred involve issues of fact to be addressed at summary judgment and/or trial ; denying #25 Motion to Dismiss (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKFJ, Judge)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation ; (Tifft, Aaron)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 10/17/2019, Replies due by 10/31/2019); granting #30 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to File Response (Re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Defendant, U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC, has filed a Motion to Dismiss Doc. [ 25] which should first be resolved. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Flash Electric Services LLC (Wohlgemuth, Joel)
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #1 Complaint ) by David West (Wohlgemuth, Joel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC (McLemore, Evan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC (McLemore, Evan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Defendant U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to September 19, 2019 is granted ; granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Re: #1 Complaint ) by U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC (Henson, Trevor)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Grant Bailey Thetford on behalf of U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC [Note: Attorney Grant Bailey Thetford added to party U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC(pty:dft).] (Thetford, Grant)
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Evan Mcguire McLemore on behalf of U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC [Note: Attorney Evan Mcguire McLemore added to party U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC(pty:dft).] (McLemore, Evan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Trevor Ray Henson on behalf of U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC [Note: Attorney Trevor Ray Henson added to party U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC(pty:dft).] (Henson, Trevor)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Barrett Lynn Powers on behalf of Flash Electric Services LLC, David West [Note: Attorney Barrett Lynn Powers added to party Flash Electric Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Barrett Lynn Powers added to party David West(pty:dft).] (Powers, Barrett)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline set 9/23/2019) ; granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Judge James H Payne. Judge Gregory K Frizzell reassigned to case., changing case number to 19-CV-439-GKF-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Flash Electric Services, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, reassigning case to Judge James H Payne, Judge Claire V Eagan no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 19-cv-439-JHP-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley Rose Ogle on behalf of Flash Electric Services LLC, David West [Note: Attorney Ashley Rose Ogle added to party Flash Electric Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Rose Ogle added to party David West(pty:dft).] (Ogle, Ashley)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Flash Electric Services LLC, David West (Wohlgemuth, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flash Electric Services LLC (Wohlgemuth, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joel L Wohlgemuth on behalf of Flash Electric Services LLC, David West [Note: Attorney Joel L Wohlgemuth added to party Flash Electric Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joel L Wohlgemuth added to party David West(pty:dft).] (Wohlgemuth, Joel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Flash Electric Services LLC (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
August 10, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Petco Petroleum Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J Kevin Hayes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hayes, J)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Aaron Christian Tifft on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tifft, Aaron) Modified on 8/9/2019 - ENTERED IN ERROR(sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Aaron Christian Tifft on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tifft, Aaron)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2090287) by Petco Petroleum Corporation (Tifft, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petco Petroleum Corporation v. West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flash Electric Services LLC
Represented By: Ashley Rose Ogle
Represented By: Barrett Lynn Powers
Represented By: Joel L Wohlgemuth
Represented By: David Robert Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David West
Represented By: Ashley Rose Ogle
Represented By: Barrett Lynn Powers
Represented By: Joel L Wohlgemuth
Represented By: David Robert Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Oil Reclaimers, LLC
Represented By: Trevor Ray Henson
Represented By: Evan Mcguire McLemore
Represented By: Grant Bailey Thetford
Represented By: John Michael Thetford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Steve Crowder
Represented By: Evan Mcguire McLemore
Represented By: Grant Bailey Thetford
Represented By: John Michael Thetford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip L Osterhout
Represented By: Evan Mcguire McLemore
Represented By: Grant Bailey Thetford
Represented By: John Michael Thetford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Hinshaw
Represented By: Mark Alan Warman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petco Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Aaron Christian Tifft
Represented By: J Kevin Hayes
Represented By: Blake H Gerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?