Van Fossen v. City of Tulsa, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: John Van Fossen
Defendant: Jennifer Murphy and City of Tulsa, Oklahoma
Case Number: 4:2019cv00445
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/18/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by R Lawson Vaughn, III on behalf of All Defendants (Vaughn, R)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephan Alan Wangsgard on behalf of All Defendants (Wangsgard, Stephan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gerald M Bender on behalf of All Defendants (Bender, Gerald)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Jennifer Murphy (Wangsgard, Stephan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by City of Tulsa, Oklahoma (Wangsgard, Stephan)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Counsel for defendants are advised that their answers are overdue. (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, State Court Petition/Complaint, #6 Status Report on Removed Action ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong attorney logged in to file; Correction: changed attorney appearing (Re: #5 Appearance - Attorney ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong attorney logged in to file; Correction: changed attorney appearing (Re: #4 Appearance - Attorney ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by City of Tulsa, Oklahoma, Jennifer Murphy (Wangsgard, Stephan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gerald Bender on behalf of All Defendants (Wangsgard, Stephan) Modified on 8/14/2019 to change text to reflect which attorney is appearing (sac, Dpty Clk).
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by R Lawson Vaughn on behalf of City of Tulsa, Oklahoma, Jennifer Murphy (Wangsgard, Stephan) Modified on 8/14/2019 to reflect which attorney is appearing (sac, Dpty Clk).
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephan Alan Wangsgard on behalf of City of Tulsa, Oklahoma, Jennifer Murphy (Wangsgard, Stephan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-19-458 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2094075) by City of Tulsa, Oklahoma, Jennifer Murphy (With attachments) (Wangsgard, Stephan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by City of Tulsa, Oklahoma, Jennifer Murphy (Wangsgard, Stephan)
February 4, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against City of Tulsa, Oklahoma, Jennifer Murphy by John Van Fossen (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Fossen v. City of Tulsa, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Van Fossen
Represented By: Andrew Michael-Don Casey
Represented By: Greg Haubrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Murphy
Represented By: Gerald M Bender
Represented By: R Lawson Vaughn, III
Represented By: Stephan Alan Wangsgard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tulsa, Oklahoma
Represented By: Gerald M Bender
Represented By: R Lawson Vaughn, III
Represented By: Stephan Alan Wangsgard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?