United States of America v. Walga Ross Group JV et al

Defendant: Walga Ross Group JV, Federal Insurance Company, Ross Group Construction Corporation, The and Walga MTE, LLC
Counter Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00459
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 19-cv-459-JED-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Walga Ross Group JV, Walga MTE, LLC, The Ross Group Construction Corporation, and Federal Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Oklahoma Western 5:19-cv-00097-PRW
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/20/2019. (ks) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Federal Insurance Company . (Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Ross Group Construction Corporation . (Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Walga MTE, LLC . (Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Walga Ross Group JV . (Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America filed by Walga Ross Group JV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subcontract Agreement)(Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Federal Insurance Company.(Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by The Ross Group Construction Corporation.(Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Walga MTE, LLC.(Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Walga Ross Group JV.(Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Transfer Case by Walga Ross Group JV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subcontract Agreement)(Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy L Rogers on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, The Ross Group Construction Corporation, Walga MTE, LLC, Walga Ross Group JV (Rogers, Timothy) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by John E Harper, Jr on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, The Ross Group Construction Corporation, Walga MTE, LLC, Walga Ross Group JV (Harper, John) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Walga Ross Group JV. Walga Ross Group JV waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Gatewood, Evan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Walga MTE, LLC. Walga MTE, LLC waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Gatewood, Evan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant The Ross Group Construction Corporation. The Ross Group Construction Corporation waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Gatewood, Evan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company. Federal Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Gatewood, Evan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Plaintiff's Response to Court's Order to Show Cause. The Court directs the plaintiff to obtain service on all defendants by June 26, 2019. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 6/5/2019. (ks) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to The Ross Group Construction Corporation, Walga MTE, LLC. (kmt) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by United States of America. (Gatewood, Evan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, Walga Ross Group JV, Walga MTE, LLC, The Ross Group Construction Corporation filed by United States of America.(Gatewood, Evan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within 14 days of the date of this order, whether service has been effected upon the Defendants, and if not, why service has not been timely made. In the absence of such a showing, this case will be dismissed without prejudice to refiling (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 5/23/2019. (ks) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Patrick R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/19/2019. (mb) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
February 4, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2857681. (Gatewood, Evan) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Federal Insurance Company, Walga Ross Group JV. (kmt) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, Walga Ross Group JV filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 8/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Walga Ross Group JV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walga Ross Group JV
Represented By: Timothy Lee Rogers
Represented By: John Edward Harper, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Lee Rogers
Represented By: John Edward Harper, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Group Construction Corporation, The
Represented By: Timothy Lee Rogers
Represented By: John Edward Harper, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walga MTE, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Lee Rogers
Represented By: John Edward Harper, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Evan Blake Gatewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?