Mako Resources, L.L.C. et al v. Trinity Operating (USG), LLC
Plaintiff: Mako Resources, L.L.C., Staab Holdings, L.L.C., TMN Resources, LLC, Golden Gas Service Company and Alan R Staab
Defendant: Trinity Operating (USG), LLC and WSGP Gas Producing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00461
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing WSGP Gas Producing, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D Morfey on behalf of WSGP Gas Producing, LLC [Note: Attorney Michael D Morfey added to party WSGP Gas Producing, LLC(pty:dft).] (Morfey, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent USG Energy Gas Producers Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Marketing, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Resources, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent NextEra Energy, Inc. for WSGP Gas Producing, LLC) by WSGP Gas Producing, LLC (Blythe, Michele)
October 15, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by WSGP Gas Producing, LLC (Blythe, Michele)
October 15, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michele R Blythe on behalf of WSGP Gas Producing, LLC [Note: Attorney Michele R Blythe added to party WSGP Gas Producing, LLC(pty:dft).] (Blythe, Michele)
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Blythe, Michele)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Golden Gas Service Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline set 10/15/2019) ; granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re #16 Amended Complaint) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #16 Amended Complaint ) by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Blythe, Michele)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Golden Gas Service Company (Ladner, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to WSGP Gas Producing, LLC (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Mako Resources, L.L.C., Staab Holdings, L.L.C., TMN Resources, LLC ; (Ladner, Thomas)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by TMN Resources, LLC, Mako Resources, L.L.C., Staab Holdings, L.L.C. (With attachments) (Ladner, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Defendant has filed a Motion to Dismiss Doc. #13 which should first be resolved (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent USG Energy Gas Producers Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Marketing, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Resources, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent NextEra Energy, Inc. for Trinity Operating (USG), LLC) by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Blythe, Michele)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Blythe, Michele)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michele R Blythe on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Blythe, Michele)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 JURY DEMAND by Mako Resources, L.L.C., Staab Holdings, L.L.C., TMN Resources, LLC (Ladner, Thomas)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TMN Resources, LLC (Ladner, Thomas)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Staab Holdings, L.L.C. (Ladner, Thomas)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mako Resources, L.L.C. (Ladner, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Mako Resources, L.L.C, TMN Resources, LLC and Staab Holdings, L.L.C to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Trinity Operating (USG), LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J Kevin Hayes on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Hayes, J)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pamela S Anderson on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Anderson, Pamela)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Anderson, Pamela)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, case number CJ-2019-02936 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2098836) by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (With attachments) (Anderson, Pamela)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Anderson, Pamela)
July 25, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by TMN Resources, LLC, Mako Resources, L.L.C., Staab Holdings, L.L.C. (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mako Resources, L.L.C. et al v. Trinity Operating (USG), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mako Resources, L.L.C.
Represented By: Roger K Eldredge
Represented By: Thomas M Ladner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staab Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By: Roger K Eldredge
Represented By: Thomas M Ladner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TMN Resources, LLC
Represented By: Roger K Eldredge
Represented By: Thomas M Ladner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Gas Service Company
Represented By: Roger K Eldredge
Represented By: Thomas M Ladner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan R Staab
Represented By: Roger K Eldredge
Represented By: Thomas M Ladner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Operating (USG), LLC
Represented By: J Kevin Hayes
Represented By: Michele R Blythe
Represented By: Pamela S Anderson
Represented By: Michael D Morfey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSGP Gas Producing, LLC
Represented By: Michele R Blythe
Represented By: Michael D Morfey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?