Recess v. St. John Health Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lametra Recess
Defendant: St. John Health Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00473
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Margaret Benson on behalf of St. John Health Systems, Inc. [Note: Attorney Margaret Benson added to party St. John Health Systems, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Benson, Margaret)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (re Atty Maggie Benson for defendant) ; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Margaret ("Maggie") Hobbs Benson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2125200) by St. John Health Systems, Inc. (With attachments) (Madison, Eva)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 2/28/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2020, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/18/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Nonjury Trial set for 6/22/2020 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT by St. John Health Systems, Inc. (Madison, Eva)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/7/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by St. John Health Systems, Inc. (Madison, Eva)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting #6 Motion for Relief (Re: #6 MOTION for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement and Brief in Support Thereof ) (RGG, Chambers)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing St. John Health Systems, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement and Brief in Support Thereof by St. John Health Systems, Inc. (Madison, Eva)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by St. John Health Systems, Inc. (Madison, Eva)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Ascension Health for St. John Health Systems, Inc.) by St. John Health Systems, Inc. (Madison, Eva)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, Oklahoma, case number CJ-2019-03091 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2102406) by St. John Health Systems, Inc. (With attachments) (Madison, Eva)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by St. John Health Systems, Inc. (Madison, Eva)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eva Camille Madison on behalf of St. John Health Systems, Inc. (Madison, Eva)
August 5, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against St. John Health Systems, Inc. by Lametra Recess (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Recess v. St. John Health Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lametra Recess
Represented By: Jean Walpole Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. John Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Eva Camille Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?