Queen et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Chrissy Lee Queen and Danny Gordon Queen
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00480
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing State Farm and Casualty Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/1/2019) (lmc, Chambers)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mia Vahlberg on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Mia Vahlberg added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Vahlberg, Mia)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Moschovidis, Barbara)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Moschovidis, Barbara)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Barbara McHugh Moschovidis on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Barbara McHugh Moschovidis added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Moschovidis, Barbara)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2103006) by Danny Gordon Queen, Chrissy Lee Queen (McGrew, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chrissy Lee Queen, Danny Gordon Queen (McGrew, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Queen et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrissy Lee Queen
Represented By: Michael Dennis McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Gordon Queen
Represented By: Michael Dennis McGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Mia Vahlberg
Represented By: Barbara McHugh Moschovidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?