Pipeline Industry Pension Fund et al v. Cofano Energy Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Local 798 Training Center and Pipeliners Local Union No. 798
Defendant: Kurt Cofano and Cofano Energy Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00484
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #15 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sac, Dpty Clk)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Cofano Energy Services, LLC and Kurt Cofano by Local 798 Training Center, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk that competency statement regarding Kurt Cofano is not included ; denying #13 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sac, Dpty Clk)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Cofano Energy Services, LLC and Kurt Cofano by Local 798 Training Center, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 (With attachments) (Warrick, William)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kurt Cofano Served September 9, 2019 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Local 798 Training Center, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan (Warrick, William)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Cofano Energy Services, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Local 798 Training Center, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan (Warrick, William)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Pipeline Industry Pension Fund; Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund; Pipeline Industry Annuity 401 (k) Plan; Local 798 Training Center; Pipelines Local Union No. 798 to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kurt Cofano, Cofano Energy Services, LLC (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 9/4/2019 to correct file date (dlg, Dpty Clk).
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Local 798 Training Center (Warrick, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 (Warrick, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan (Warrick, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund (Warrick, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pipeline Industry Pension Fund (Warrick, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Brant Warrick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Warrick, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2103641) by Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Local 798 Training Center, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan (Warrick, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Local 798 Training Center, Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan, Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund, Pipeline Industry Pension Fund, Pipeliners Local Union No. 798 [Note: Attorney William Brant Warrick added to party Local 798 Training Center(pty:pla), Attorney William Brant Warrick added to party Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan(pty:pla), Attorney William Brant Warrick added to party Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund(pty:pla), Attorney William Brant Warrick added to party Pipeline Industry Pension Fund(pty:pla), Attorney William Brant Warrick added to party Pipeliners Local Union No. 798(pty:pla).] (Warrick, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pipeline Industry Pension Fund et al v. Cofano Energy Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipeline Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: William Brant Warrick
Represented By: Louis L Robein, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipeline Industry Annuity 401(K) Plan
Represented By: William Brant Warrick
Represented By: Louis L Robein, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipeline Industry Benefit Fund
Represented By: William Brant Warrick
Represented By: Louis L Robein, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 798 Training Center
Represented By: William Brant Warrick
Represented By: Louis L Robein, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipeliners Local Union No. 798
Represented By: William Brant Warrick
Represented By: Louis L Robein, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Cofano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cofano Energy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?