Brown v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donald R Brown
Defendant: Davol, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00492
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 ***Remark: Case transferred from Oklahoma Northern has been opened in Southern District of Ohio as case 2:19-cv-04325, filed 09/27/2019. (sac, Dpty Clk)
September 26, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #13 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the MDL Panel, transferring case (terminates case) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER from MDL re: transferee clerk to transmit a certified copy of the Panel Order to transfer to the district court from which the action is being transferred (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 ***Remark: Received Conditional Transfer Order from MDL re: stay is lifted (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Davol, Inc.) by Davol, Inc. (Buchan, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C.R. Bard, Inc.) by C.R. Bard, Inc. (Buchan, James)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. 7) is granted. Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is due September 27, 2019. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/27/2019); granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. (Buchan, James)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing C.R. Bard, Inc. and Davol, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 JURY DEMAND by Davol, Inc. (Buchan, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. (Buchan, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Craig Buchan on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. (Buchan, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa, case number CJ-2019-03194 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2105336) by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. (Buchan, James)
August 14, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Donald R Brown (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol, Inc.
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R Brown
Represented By: Paul Telhiard Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?