Chatman v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Diane Chatman
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv00495
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 31 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (With attachments) (Smiley, Stephanie)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Doc. 28) of attorney Thomas Wm. Arbon is granted. Mr. Arbon may appear in this matter on behalf of the plaintiff. ; granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
November 1, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Wm Arbon on behalf of Diane Chatman [Note: Attorney Thomas Wm Arbon added to party Diane Chatman(pty:pla).] (Arbon, Thomas)
October 31, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas Wm. Arbon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2129255) by Diane Chatman (With attachments) (Sill, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew James Sill on behalf of Diane Chatman [Note: Attorney Matthew James Sill added to party Diane Chatman(pty:pla).] (Sill, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hiba Kazim on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated [Note: Attorney Hiba Kazim added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Hiba Kazim added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (Kazim, Hiba)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/4/2019) (SAS, Chambers)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The motion to withdraw attorney Richard B. North, Jr. as counsel for the Defendants is granted. ; terminating attorney Richard B North, Jr ; granting #21 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hiba Kazim (Doc. 20) is granted. Ms. Kazim may appear in this matter on behalf of the Defendants. ; granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephanie Smiley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated [Note: Attorney Stephanie Smiley added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Smiley added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (Smiley, Stephanie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) and Substitution of Counsel by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Buchan, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Hiba Kazim to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2114128) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie R. Smiley (Doc. 18) is granted. Ms. Smiley may appear in this matter on behalf of the Defendants. ; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephanie R. Smiley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2112203) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, changing case number to 19-CV-495-JED-FHM, recusing Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne. Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy reassigned to case. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Incorporated) by C R Bard Incorporated (Buchan, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated (Buchan, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Craig Buchan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated [Note: Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (Buchan, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Micah John Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated [Note: Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (Petersen, Micah)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 ***Remark: Notice of Filing Submission Regarding Remand or Transfer of Certain Cases filed in case #2:15-MD-2641-DGC (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 ***Remark: master docket sheet of MDL action In Re Bard IVC Filters Products Liability Litigation (2:15-md-2641-DGC) (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 ***Remark: certified copy of Suggestion of Remand and Tranfer Order of MDL action In Re Bard IVC Filters Products Liability Litigation (2:15-md-2641-DGC) (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Richard B North Jr (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Ben C Martin (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 19-CV-495-JED-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Arizona
September 10, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Northern District of Oklahoma via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 819/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3595-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13512482 filed by Diane Chatman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatman v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: Stephanie Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: Stephanie Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Chatman
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Represented By: Matthew James Sill
Represented By: Thomas Wm Arbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?