Wilson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Alan Wilson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00511
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachael Faye Zintgraff on behalf of Social Security Administration [Note: Attorney Rachael Faye Zintgraff added to party Social Security Administration(pty:dft).] (Zintgraff, Rachael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration Commissioner, Attorney General & US Attorney (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Jeffrey Alan Wilson (Troutman, Gayle)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 ***Remark: 3 summons in hold tray (jjs, Dpty Clk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge [includes the following attachments: (1) a Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, and (2) a copy of General Order 16-08] (jjs, Dpty Clk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gayle Louise Troutman on behalf of Jeffrey Alan Wilson (Troutman, Gayle)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Supporting Affidavit by Jeffrey Alan Wilson (Troutman, Gayle)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Jeffrey Alan Wilson (Troutman, Gayle)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jeffrey Alan Wilson (Troutman, Gayle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Alan Wilson
Represented By: Gayle Louise Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?