Bright et al v. CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sarah Bright and Mike Bright
Defendant: CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00520
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 4/30/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2020, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT by CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Edmonds, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 JURY DEMAND by Mike Bright, Sarah Bright (Fulda, Ryan)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/12/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Edmonds, James)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan James Fulda on behalf of Mike Bright, Sarah Bright (Fulda, Ryan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Edmonds, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Edmonds, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Edmonds, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Parties of Removal by CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Edmonds, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Edmonds, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2019-03609 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2115178) by CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (With attachments) (Edmonds, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Edmonds, James)
September 13, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company by Mike Bright, Sarah Bright (alg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bright et al v. CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Bright
Represented By: Ryan James Fulda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Bright
Represented By: Ryan James Fulda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: James Newton Edmonds
Represented By: William Anthony Fiasco
Represented By: Ashley Ann Janzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?