Wade v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Gene Wade, Jr
Defendant: Laureate Institute, Tulsa County, Ryan Braschler, TCBH, Carter Rupp, Ann Bliss, United States of America, William Musseman, City of Glenpool, Unidentified staff TCBH, G T Bynun, Tom Cooper, Don Deramus, City of Tulsa, Donald Trump, Theresa Drieling, Gerald Bender, Kirsten Pace, Mark Bradshaw, Kevin Stitt, Tim Fox, Jason A Robertson, Gregory Mitchell, John Dowdell, Unidentified staff Laureate, John Kelly Warren, Pierce, Couch, et al, Terrence Kern, Chuck Jordan, State of Oklahoma, Warren Foundation, The, Saint Francis Health Network, OMAG, Laureate Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital, Saint Francis Health System, Inc., William K Warren Foundation, The and Sarah A Bliss
Case Number: 4:2019cv00521
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
2 Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #32 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #14 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #18 Motion to Dismiss (Re: #31 NOTICE of Dismissal ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Dismissal voluntarily by Ronald Gene Wade, Jr (jjs, Dpty Clk) Modified on 11/13/2019 to Notice of Dismissal pursuant to Order #32 (kjp, Dpty Clk).
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Motions to Dismiss have been filed which should first be resolved. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Laureate Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital (O'Connor, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saint Francis Health System, Inc. (O'Connor, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by William K Warren Foundation, The (O'Connor, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Dr. Ann Bliss be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #22 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Saint Francis Health Network be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #21 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Laureate Institute be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #20 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for The Warren Foundation be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #19 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Ann Bliss (O'Connor, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Saint Francis Health Network (O'Connor, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Laureate Institute (O'Connor, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Warren Foundation, The (O'Connor, William)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by William Musseman, Kirsten Pace (Lawson, Stefanie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stefanie Erin Lawson on behalf of William Musseman, Kirsten Pace [Note: Attorney Stefanie Erin Lawson added to party William Musseman(pty:dft), Attorney Stefanie Erin Lawson added to party Kirsten Pace(pty:dft).] (Lawson, Stefanie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing The Warren Foundation, Saint Francis Health Network, and Laureate Institute to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kristen Pence Evans on behalf of Ann Bliss, Tom Cooper, Laureate Institute, Saint Francis Health Network, John Kelly Warren, Warren Foundation, The [Note: Attorney Kristen Pence Evans added to party Ann Bliss(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Pence Evans added to party Tom Cooper(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Pence Evans added to party Laureate Institute(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Pence Evans added to party Saint Francis Health Network(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Pence Evans added to party John Kelly Warren (pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Pence Evans added to party Warren Foundation, The(pty:dft).] (Evans, Kristen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Ann Bliss, Tom Cooper, Laureate Institute, Saint Francis Health Network, John Kelly Warren, Warren Foundation, The (O'Connor, William)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Walker O'Connor on behalf of Ann Bliss, Tom Cooper, Laureate Institute, Saint Francis Health Network, John Kelly Warren, Warren Foundation, The [Note: Attorney William Walker O'Connor added to party Ann Bliss(pty:dft), Attorney William Walker O'Connor added to party Tom Cooper(pty:dft), Attorney William Walker O'Connor added to party Laureate Institute(pty:dft), Attorney William Walker O'Connor added to party Saint Francis Health Network(pty:dft), Attorney William Walker O'Connor added to party John Kelly Warren (pty:dft), Attorney William Walker O'Connor added to party Warren Foundation, The(pty:dft).] (O'Connor, William)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by City of Glenpool, Tim Fox (Berkhouse, Jordan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jordan L. Berkhouse on behalf of City of Glenpool, Tim Fox [Note: Attorney Jordan L. Berkhouse added to party City of Glenpool(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan L. Berkhouse added to party Tim Fox(pty:dft).] (Berkhouse, Jordan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Adrian LeBlanc on behalf of City of Glenpool, Tim Fox [Note: Attorney Thomas Adrian LeBlanc added to party City of Glenpool(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Adrian LeBlanc added to party Tim Fox(pty:dft).] (LeBlanc, Thomas)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Kevin Stitt (Norwood, Lexie)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lexie P Norwood on behalf of Kevin Stitt [Note: Attorney Lexie P Norwood added to party Kevin Stitt(pty:dft).] (Norwood, Lexie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Gerald Bender, Ann Bliss, Mark Bradshaw, Ryan Braschler, G T Bynun, City of Glenpool, City of Tulsa, Tom Cooper, Don Deramus, John Dowdell, Theresa Drieling, Tim Fox, Chuck Jordan, Terrence Kern, Laureate Institute, William Musseman, OMAG, Kirsten Pace, Pierce, Couch, et al, Jason A Robertson, Carter Rupp, Saint Francis Health Network, Tulsa County, John Kelly Warren, Warren Foundation, The by Ronald Gene Wade, Jr (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Judge Terence Kern. Judge Gregory K Frizzell reassigned to case., changing case number to 19-cv-521-GKF-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Chief Judge John E Dowdell. Judge Terence Kern reassigned to case., changing case number to 19-CV-521-TCK-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to State of Oklahoma, Kevin Stitt, Donald Trump, United States of America (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Ronald Gene Wade, Jr (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Ronald Gene Wade, Jr (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ronald Gene Wade, Jr (dlg, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laureate Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Braschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Bliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Musseman
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Glenpool
Represented By: Jordan L. Berkhouse
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified staff TCBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G T Bynun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Cooper
Represented By: Kristen Pence Evans
Represented By: William Walker O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Deramus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tulsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Drieling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Pace
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stitt
Represented By: Lexie P Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Fox
Represented By: Jordan L. Berkhouse
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason A Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dowdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified staff Laureate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kelly Warren
Represented By: Kristen Pence Evans
Represented By: William Walker O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce, Couch, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Foundation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Francis Health Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMAG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laureate Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital
Represented By: Kristen Pence Evans
Represented By: William Walker O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Francis Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Pence Evans
Represented By: William Walker O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William K Warren Foundation, The
Represented By: Kristen Pence Evans
Represented By: William Walker O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah A Bliss
Represented By: Kristen Pence Evans
Represented By: William Walker O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Gene Wade, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?