Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00524
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Williams, Paula)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER of Service of Summons sent to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP Returned Executed (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Holman, Patrick)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy M Stipe on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP [Note: Attorney Amy M Stipe added to party Wal-Mart Stores East, LP(pty:dft).] (Stipe, Amy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paula Michelle Williams on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP [Note: Attorney Paula Michelle Williams added to party Wal-Mart Stores East, LP(pty:dft).] (Williams, Paula)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher S Thrutchley on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP [Note: Attorney Christopher S Thrutchley added to party Wal-Mart Stores East, LP(pty:dft).] (Thrutchley, Christopher)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lauren W Johnston on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Johnston, Lauren)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick JoHugh Holman on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Holman, Patrick)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Holman, Patrick)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Holman, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Amy M Stipe
Represented By: Christopher S Thrutchley
Represented By: Paula Michelle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Patrick JoHugh Holman
Represented By: Andrea G Baran
Represented By: Lauren W Johnston
Represented By: Carl Felix Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?