Wentzel v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: John Wentzel
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv00567
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; terminating attorney John A Dalimonte ; granting #27 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
December 10, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by John Wentzel (Stoller, Paul)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (re Attys Paul L. Stoller and Ashley C. Crowell for plaintiff) ; granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers)
November 25, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ashley C. Crowell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2140889) by John Wentzel (With attachments) (Rust, Andrea)
November 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul L. Stoller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2140877) by John Wentzel (With attachments) (Rust, Andrea)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated [Note: Attorney Stephanie Smiley added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Smiley added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (With attachments) (Smiley, Stephanie)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrea Rae Rust on behalf of John Wentzel [Note: Attorney Andrea Rae Rust added to party John Wentzel(pty:pla).] (Rust, Andrea)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hiba Kazim on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated [Note: Attorney Hiba Kazim added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Hiba Kazim added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (Kazim, Hiba)
October 29, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephanie Smiley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Smiley, Stephanie)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Stephanie R. Smiley and Kiba Kazim are admitted pro hac vice for the limited purpose of representing defendants in the above-captioned matter. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is withdrawn / terminated as counsel in this matter. ; terminating attorney Richard B North, Jr ; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (Re: #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Hiba Kazim to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2127348), #18 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) and Substitution of Counsel, #16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephanie Smiley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2127346) ) (RGG, Chambers)
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) and Substitution of Counsel by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Buchan, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Hiba Kazim to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2127348) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephanie Smiley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2127346) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Incorporated) by C R Bard Incorporated (Buchan, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated (Buchan, James)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, recusing Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne. Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy reassigned to case., changing case number to 19-cv-567-CVE-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Micah John Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated [Note: Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (Petersen, Micah)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Craig Buchan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated [Note: Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (Buchan, James)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/25/2019) (RGG, Chambers)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Richard B North Jr (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to John A Dalimonte (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Ashley Crowell and Paul Lincoln Stoller (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 19-cv-567-CVE-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Arizona
October 22, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the Northern District of Oklahoma via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-04173-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16985003 filed by John Wentzel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wentzel v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: Stephanie Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: Stephanie Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wentzel
Represented By: John A Dalimonte
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Ashley Crowell
Represented By: Andrea Rae Rust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?